Barcus v. The Phoenix Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: William Lane Barcus
Defendant: The Phoenix Insurance Co.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02492
Filed: August 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Miami
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 111 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 5/7/2019. (mls)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 92 Plaintiff's Daubert Motion/Motion in Limine to Limit the Testimony of Rachel Jensen; denying 93 Plaintiff's Second Daubert Motion/Motion in Limine to Limit the Testimony of Keith Kobes; denying 94 Plaintiff's Third Daubert Motion/Motion in Limine to Limit the Testimony of Maria Korth; granting in part and denying in part 95 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Julia Johnson, Pursuant to Rule 703 and Daubert v. Merrell Dow; and granting 96 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Michael Dreiling, Pursuant to Rule 703 and Daubert v. Merrell Dow. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 1/25/2019. (mls)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 79 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/17/18. (df)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/19/19. (df)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/16/18. (df)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barcus v. The Phoenix Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lane Barcus
Represented By: Steven A. Ediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Phoenix Insurance Co.
Represented By: Jennifer R. Johnson
Represented By: Michelle R. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?