Ross v. Jenkins et al
Plaintiff: Kendra Ross
Defendant: Royall Jenkins, Value Creators Inc., The and Value Creators LLC, The
Case Number: 2:2017cv02547
Filed: September 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Daniel D. Crabtree
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 269 Renewed Partial Motion for Default Judgment. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 55 and D. Kan. Rule 77.2, the Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment against defendants The Promise Keepers, Inc., The Promise Keepers 417, Inc., and The Promise Keepers 417 Inc. for $300,000 plus post-judgment interest at the rate permitted by law. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 7/17/2020. (smc)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER deferring ruling as to 269 Motion for Default Judgment. It is therefore ordered by the Court that plaintiff must: (1) contact the courtroom deputy to schedule an evidentiary hearing on the issue of damages, or (2) supplement her motion with additional information, such as an affidavit or declaration "sworn under penalty of perjury," by June 24, 2020. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 6/9/2020. (smc)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 271 Motion to Withdraw Bench Warrant. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 6/8/2020. (hw)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling 208 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 3/16/2020. (smc)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 184 Motion to Vacate ; denying 196 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/9/19. (hw)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The court will strike all future motions filed in this case by individuals who are neither parties to the case nor attorneys licensed to practice law in this court. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/23/2019. (tvn)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 112 plaintiff Kendra Ross's Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/31/2019. (tvn)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/24/2019. Mailed to movant Rodney Dale Class by regular mail. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(tvn)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT THAT all requests made by Dwight Johnson and Irma Dorsey are denied. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/23/2019. Mailed to movants Irma Dorsey and Dwight Johnson by regular mail. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(tvn)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 199 Amended Second Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 06/18/2019. (mig)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 124 movant Ephraim Woods's Motion to Dismiss; denying 133 movant Dana Peach's Motion to Dismiss; denying 135 movant Marvin McIntosh's Motion to Dismiss; denying 137 movant Griegory Moten's M otion to Dismiss; denying 182 movant Griegory Moten's Motion to Vacate; denying 183 movant Dana Peach's Motion to Vacate; denying 197 movant Ephraim Woods's Motion to Dismiss; denying 198 movant Irma Dorsey's Motion to D ismiss; denying 201 movant Ephraim Woods's Motion to Strike; denying 202 movant Irma Dorsey's Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 06/17/2019. Mailed to movants Ephraim Woods, Jr., Dana M. Peach, Marvin McIntosh, Griegory Moten and Irma Dorsey by regular mail. (tvn)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 185 plaintiff's Second Motion to Disburse Garnished Funds Deposited into the Registry of the Court by Bank of America, N.A. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 04/10/2019. (mig)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 170 Non-Party Marvin L. McIntosh's Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Subpoena. See order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/13/2019. Mailed to pro se non-party Marvin L. McIntosh by regular mail and sent by email to drmarvin04@sbcglobal.net. (ts)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 163 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 02/27/2019. (mig)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 142 Judgment Creditor's Motion to Quash Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/29/2019. Mailed to non-party Ephraim Woods via regular mail. (ts)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 133 Motion for Hearing; regarding 133 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion for Hearing; regarding 135 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion for Hearing; regarding 137 Motion to Dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 01/22/2019. Mailed to non-parties Ephraim Woods, Jr. via regular and certified mail (7018 0680 0001 8174 1356 ), Griegory L. Moten via regular and certified mail (7018 0680 0001 8174 1332), Atif Abdel-Khaliq via regular mail and certified mail (7018 0680 0001 8174 1349 and 7017 1000 0000 0699 6228), Marvin L. McIntosh via regular and certified mail (7017 1000 0000 0699 6235) and Dana Peach via regular and certified mail (7017 1000 0000 0699 6242). (tvn)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding 112 Motion for Order to Show Cause, 121 Motion to Strike, 124 Motion to Dismiss and granting in part and denying in part 124 Motion for Hearing. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crab tree on 01/04/2019. Mailed to non-parties Ephraim Woods, Jr. via regular and certified mail (7017 1000 0000 0699 6365), Griegory L. Moten via regular and certified mail (7017 1000 0000 0699 6372), Atif Abdel-Khaliq via regular mail and certified mail (7017 1000 0000 0699 6389 and 7017 1000 0000 0699 6303) and Marvin L. McIntosh via regular and certified mail (7017 1000 0000 0699 6310). (tvn)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT plaintiff's oral motion for a bench warrant during the October 18, 2018, Show Cause Hearing is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT a Bench Warrant be issued for the arrest of defendant Royall Jenkins and for his prompt appearance before this court. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 11/02/2018. (tvn)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 42 defendant Royall Jenkins's Motion for New Trial; granting 45 plaintiff Kendra Ross's Motion for Writ of Execution. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the United States Marshal must execute the default judgment in the fashion directed by this Order. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/02/2018. (tvn)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 70 Judgment Creditor's Motion to Compel Responses to Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Judgment Debtors shall comply within ten calendar days of the date of this order, and shall pay Judgment Creditor's costs and fees connected with this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/30/2018. (ts)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 43 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/26/2018. (ts)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 23 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 5/23/18. Mailed to pro se Defendants by regular mail. (kao)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 37 Motion to Redact Transcript. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 4/25/18. Mailed to all defendants by regular mail. (kao)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 18 Motion for Writ of Certiorari filed by Defendant Royall Jenkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/16/2017. Mailed to pro se party Royall Jenkins by regular mail. (ts)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Jenkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Ross
Represented By: Gillian Chadwick
Represented By: Phillip C. Chang
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royall Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Creators Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Creators LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?