Donahue v. Kansas Board of Education et al

Petitioner: Toni R. Donahue
Respondent: Kansas Board of Education, Elena Lincoln, Mark Ward, Lloyd Swartz, Scott Gordon and Randy Watson
Case Number: 2:2018cv02012
Filed: January 10, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Bourbon
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2018 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendant Lloyd Swartz are dismissed, and he is terminated as a party to this action. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/27/2018. Mailed to pro se party Toni R Donahue by regular mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 70180680000181740083 (ydm)
August 1, 2018 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 85 Motion to Stay Case; denying 88 Motion Requesting Permission to File Interlocutory Appeal. The court has denied plaintiff's motion to stay, plaintiff is once again ordered to show cause why the court should no t dismiss defendant Lloyd Swartz as an improper party within fourteen days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. If plaintiff is unable to demonstrate a legal basis for keeping defendant Swartz in this case for judicial review, the court will dismiss defendant Swartz from the case. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/1/2018. Mailed to pro se party Toni Donahue by regular mail and certified mail; certified # 70180680000181740014. (ydm)
June 20, 2018 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 32 Motion to Review Magistrate Order; granting 33 Motion to Dismiss Party Elena Lincoln; denying as moot 36 Defendant's Elena Lincoln's Motion to Stay Case; granting 49 Motion to Dismiss Parties Kan sas Board of Education, Randy Watson, Mark Ward and Scott Gordon; denying 62 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Order of Protection ; denying in part and granting in part 64 Motion to Dismiss. The only claim remaining is the request for the judicial review of the due process hearing and subsequent administrative review; granting 66 Motion to Dismiss defendants John Allison and Deborah Chappell. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff is ordered to show cause why the court should not dismiss defendant Lloyd Swartz as an improper party within fourteen days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. If plaintiff is unable to demonstrate a legal basis for keeping defendant Lloyd Swartz in this case for judicial review, the court will dismiss defendant from the case. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 6/20/2018.Mailed to pro se party Toni Donahue by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 70171000000006997218 (ydm)
March 19, 2018 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, denying as moot 28 motion for partial reconsideration of the court's March 2, 2018 order. See order for details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/19/2018. Mailed to pro se party Lloyd Swartz by regular mail. (amh)
March 6, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff is hereby informed that, within 14 days after she is served with a copy of this order, she may, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D. Kan. Rule 72.1.4(a), file written objections to this or der by filing a motion requesting that the presiding U.S. district judge review this order. A party must file any objections within the 14-day period if the party wants to have appellate review of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/6/2018. Mailed to pro se party Lloyd Swartz by regular mail. (ydm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donahue v. Kansas Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Toni R. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kansas Board of Education
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elena Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Ward
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lloyd Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Gordon
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Watson
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?