Morgan v. Wesley Medical Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kelli Morgan
Defendant: Wesley Medical Center, LLC, Bridget Grover, Gregory Faimon, Lisa Judd, Via Christi Hospitals Wichita, Inc., Aaron Kent, Bala Bhaskar Reddy Bhimavarapu, Jennifer Chambers-Daney, Connor Hartpence, Stefanie White and Jamie Borick
Case Number: 2:2018cv02158
Filed: April 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 511 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 440 Motion For Summary Judgment For Defendant Dr. Gregory Faimon and 442 Motion For Partial Summary Judgment As To Plaintiff's Punitive Damage Claims By Defendant Bridget Grover, PA-C. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 9/22/2020. (smc)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 508 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 444 Motion For Partial Summary Judgment As To Plaintiff's Punitive Damage Claims By Jennifer Chambers-Daney, APRN; sustaining 448 Motion For Partial Summary Judgment As To Plaintiff's Punitive Damage Claims By CEP America-KS LLC. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 9/14/2020. (smc)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 502 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 446 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Punitive Damage Claims by Connor Hartpence, M.D., Stefanie White, M.D., and Jamie Borick, M.D. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 9/1/2020. (smc)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 499 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 438 Motion For Summary Judgment On Plaintiff's Claim For Punitive Damages Against Dr. Bala Bhaskar Reddy Bhimavarapu M.D. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/14/2020. (smc)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 495 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 433 Defendants' Joint Motion To Exclude TheCausation Testimony And Opinions Of Plaintiff's Expert, Roger E. Huckfeldt, M.D. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/7/2020. (smc)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 487 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 430 Motion for Summary Judgment By Connor Hartpence, M.D.. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 7/23/2020. (heo)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 486 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 452 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement & Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Settling Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2020 at 11:00 AM by Telephone CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 1654737 before District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. See Order for additional details and deadline. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 7/20/2020. (smc)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response is due by 6/24/2020. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/18/2020. (smc)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 429 Defendants Via Christi Hospitals Wichita, Inc. And Aaron Kent, RN's Motion To File Under Seal Joint Motion For Approval Of Settlement And Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice As To Settling Defendants. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 4/28/2020. (smc)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 388 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 378 Motion for Reconsideration re 377 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/25/19. (df)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 365 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/19/19. (df)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 356 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/25/19. (df)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 123 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages or, in the Alternative, to Strike Said Claim ; overruling 129 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages or, in the Alternative , to Strike Said Claim in Amended Complaint; overruling 145 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages or, in the Alternative, To Strike Said Claim in Amended Complaint; overruling 147 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages; overruling 148 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages; overruling 157 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim For Punitive Damages; overruling 166 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim For Punitive Damages. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/12/19. (hw)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 264 Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena to Non-Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/24/19. (df)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 266 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/9/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 272 Motion for Reconsideration re 267 Order on Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 274 Motion for Reconsideration re 267 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/6/19. (df)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 234 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/14/19. (df)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 214 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/25/19. (df)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 193 Motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/20/18. (df)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 96 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/6/18. (df)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion to Strike 1 Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Strike 1 Complaint; denying 60 Motion to Strike 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/5/18. (df)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Wesley Medical Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: G. Andrew Marino
Represented By: Michelle M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridget Grover
Represented By: Tracy A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Faimon
Represented By: Tracy A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Judd
Represented By: G. Andrew Marino
Represented By: Michelle M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Via Christi Hospitals Wichita, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Wooding
Represented By: Samantha M. H. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Kent
Represented By: David S. Wooding
Represented By: Samantha M. H. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bala Bhaskar Reddy Bhimavarapu
Represented By: Don D. Gribble, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Chambers-Daney
Represented By: Brian L. White
Represented By: Gregory S. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connor Hartpence
Represented By: Christopher S. Cole
Represented By: Steven C. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefanie White
Represented By: Christopher S. Cole
Represented By: Steven C. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Borick
Represented By: Christopher S. Cole
Represented By: Steven C. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Morgan
Represented By: Benjamin Tyler Friesen
Represented By: Daniel Bernard Giroux
Represented By: Michael J. Kuckelman
Represented By: Stephen J. Torline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?