Turner v. Wyandotte County, Kansas, Unified Government of et al
Plaintiff: John Turner
Defendant: Wyandotte County, Kansas, Unified Government of and Kansas City, Kansas, Police Department
Case Number: 2:2018cv02202
Filed: April 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 117 Motion for Summary Judgment on Retaliatory Harassment Claim. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/7/2020. (smc)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 113 MOTION to Amend/Correct and Objections to Supplemental Pretrial Order (Doc. 108). Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/19/2020. (hw)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 95 Motion for Reconsideration re 92 Memorandum and Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court requests that Judge James conduct a supplemental pretrial conference no later than May 1, 2020, and enter a supp lemental pretrial order which expressly includes plaintiff's retaliatory harassment claim. On or before May 4, 2020, defendant may file a motion for summary judgment on such claim. Any response from plaintiff shall be filed on or before May 11, 2020, and defendant's reply shall be filed on or before May 14, 2020. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 4/16/2020. (ydm)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustained in part 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 3/2/2020. (ydm)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 77 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 2/6/2020. (ydm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Wyandotte County, Kansas, Unified Government of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Turner
Represented By: Sarah A. Brown
Represented By: Daniel G. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyandotte County, Kansas, Unified Government of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City, Kansas, Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?