Green v. Blake et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S Green
Defendant: Christian Blake and Joshua Leonard
Case Number: 2:2018cv02247
Filed: May 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Presiding Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 37 MOTION for Joinder filed by Jeffrey S Green, 39 MOTION to Amend Complaint re 1 Complaint (attorney) filed by Jeffrey S Green. The parties are hereby informed that, within 14 days after being served with a copy of this report and recommendation, they may, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, file written objections to the report and recommendation. A party must file any objections within the 14-day period a llowed if it wants to have appellate review of the proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law, or the recommended disposition. If a party does not timely file objections, no court will allow appellate review. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/25/19. Mailed to pro se party Christian Blake and Joshua Leonard by regular mail. (hw)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 defendants' Motion to Dismiss; denying 9 defendants' Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 08/12/2019. Mailed to pro se parties Christian Blake and Joshua Leonard by regular mail. (tvn)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 27 motion for early discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/29/2019. Mailed to pro se defendants by regular mail. (amh)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The court requests briefing from the parties. See Order for details. The parties shall submit their briefs on these issues, limited to twenty double-spaced pages, by September 28, 2018. Defendants are directed to submit to chambers by Septembe r 28, 2018, any e-mails they contend support their motion to disqualify. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 09/14/2018. Mailed to pro se parties Christian Blake and Joshua Leonard by regular and certified mail; Certified Tracking Numbers: 7012 3460 0000 8262 6658 and 7017 1000 0000 0699 6327.(tvn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Blake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S Green
Represented By: Joel B. Laner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?