Gantulga v. Aron et al

Plaintiff: Naranbold Gantulga
Defendant: Lloyd Hill, Lin Zhang, Adam M Aron, Kathleen M Pawlus, Anthony J Saich, Chris A Cox, Maojun Zeng, Gary F Locke, Craig R Ramsey, Jack Q Gao, Howard W Koch, Jr, AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Adam M. Aron, Kathleen M. Pawlus, Jack Q. Gao, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Craig R. Ramsey, Anthony J. Saich, Lincoln Zhang, Dalian Wanda Group Co., Chris A. Cox and Gary F. Locke
Case Number: 2:2018cv02262
Filed: May 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case opened in Southern District of New York (18-10007). (hw)
October 15, 2018 Case transferred to Southern District of New York.(ydm)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants do not need to respond to the Amended Complaint, and that there is no need for the parties to file a report of their Fed. R. Civ.P. 26(f) planning conference. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 10/15/2018. (ydm)
October 12, 2018 Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendants AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Adam M. Aron, Chris A. Cox, Jack Q. Gao, Lloyd Hill, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Gary F. Locke, Kathleen M. Pawlus, Craig R. Ramsey, Anthony J. Saich, Maojun Zeng, Lincoln Zhang (Chaffee-McClure, Zach)
October 10, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 26 (A)(1) by Naranbold Gantulga. (Renwick, Karen)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part #33 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time and for the Parties to Submit a Proposed Briefing Schedule. Defendants are granted an extension of time, to and including 10/15/2018, in which to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #31 Amended Complaint. If the parties would like to file a motion proposing a schedule for briefing any motion Defendants may file seeking to dismiss the amended complaint, District Judge Robinson will decide that issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/2/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
September 27, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #31 Amended Complaint by Defendants AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Adam M. Aron, Chris A. Cox, Jack Q. Gao, Lloyd Hill, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Gary F. Locke, Kathleen M. Pawlus, Craig R. Ramsey, Anthony J. Saich, Maojun Zeng, Lincoln Zhang (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Chaffee-McClure, Zach)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER finding as moot #24 Motion to Dismiss. In light of the Amended Complaint filed on September 17, 2018 (Doc. 31), this motion is hereby moot. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 9/19/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams)
September 17, 2018 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT -Verified Amended Shareholder Derivative Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Naranbold Gantulga.(Renwick, Karen)
September 10, 2018 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Naranbold Gantulga re #24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Altenative, to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Index of Exhibits)(Renwick, Karen)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2018 at 02:00 PM (central time) before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. The conference will be held by telephone. Participating counsel must dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26(a) initial disclosures due 10/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/4/2018. (byk)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John A. Neuwirth for AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Adam M. Aron, Chris A. Cox, Jack Q. Gao, Lloyd Hill, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Gary F. Locke, Kathleen M. Pawlus, Craig R. Ramsey, Anthony J. Saich, Maojun Zeng, and Lin Zhang pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/28/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew S. Connors for AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Adam M. Aron, Chris A. Cox, Jack Q. Gao, Lloyd Hill, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Gary F. Locke, Kathleen M. Pawlus, Craig R. Ramsey, Anthony J. Saich, Maojun Zeng, and Lin Zhang pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/28/2018. (ydm)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua S. Amsel for AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Adam M. Aron, Chris A. Cox, Jack Q. Gao, Lloyd Hill, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Gary F. Locke, Kathleen M. Pawlus, Craig R. Ramsey, Anthony J. Saich, Maojun Zeng, and Lin Zhang pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/28/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
August 27, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Altenative, to Transfer by Defendants AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Adam M. Aron, Chris A. Cox, Jack Q. Gao, Lloyd Hill, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Gary F. Locke, Kathleen M. Pawlus, Craig R. Ramsey, Anthony J. Saich, Maojun Zeng, Lin Zhang (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Chaffee-McClure, Zach)
August 27, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Altenative, to Transfer by Defendants AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Adam M. Aron, Chris A. Cox, Jack Q. Gao, Lloyd Hill, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Gary F. Locke, Kathleen M. Pawlus, Craig R. Ramsey, Anthony J. Saich, Maojun Zeng, Lin Zhang (Chaffee-McClure, Zach)
August 27, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for John A. Neuwirth to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4567301.) by Defendants AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Adam M. Aron, Chris A. Cox, Jack Q. Gao, Lloyd Hill, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Gary F. Locke, Kathleen M. Pawlus, Craig R. Ramsey, Anthony J. Saich, Maojun Zeng, Lin Zhang (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form)(Rebein, Joseph)
August 27, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Matthew S. Connors to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4567287.) by Defendants AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Adam M. Aron, Chris A. Cox, Jack Q. Gao, Lloyd Hill, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Gary F. Locke, Kathleen M. Pawlus, Craig R. Ramsey, Anthony J. Saich, Maojun Zeng, Lin Zhang (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form)(Rebein, Joseph)
August 27, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney Joshua S. Amsel to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4567237.) by Defendants AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Adam M. Aron, Chris A. Cox, Jack Q. Gao, Lloyd Hill, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Gary F. Locke, Kathleen M. Pawlus, Craig R. Ramsey, Anthony J. Saich, Maojun Zeng, Lin Zhang (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form)(Rebein, Joseph)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. Defendants Adam M. Aron, Craig R. Ramsey, Chris A. Cox, Lin Zhang, Jack Q. Gao, Maojun Zeng, Anthony J. Saich, Lloyd Hill, Gary F. Locke, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Kathleen M. Pawlus, and Nominal Defendant AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc. are hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including 8/27/2018, in which to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/24/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
July 23, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Adam M. Aron, Chris A. Cox, Jack Q. Gao, Lloyd Hill, Howard W. Koch, Jr., Gary F. Locke, Kathleen M. Pawlus, Craig R. Ramsey, Anthony J. Saich, Maojun Zeng, Lin Zhang. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Chaffee-McClure, Zach)
July 23, 2018 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc. identifying Dalian Wanda Group, Co., Ltd. as corporate parent. (Chaffee-McClure, Zach)
June 21, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Naranbold Gantulga. Maojun Zeng waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Renwick, Karen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Naranbold Gantulga. Lloyd Hill waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Renwick, Karen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Naranbold Gantulga. Lin Zhang waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Renwick, Karen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Naranbold Gantulga. Kathleen M. Pawlus waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Renwick, Karen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Naranbold Gantulga. Jack Q. Gao waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Renwick, Karen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Naranbold Gantulga. Howard W. Koch, Jr. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Renwick, Karen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Naranbold Gantulga. Gary F. Locke waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Renwick, Karen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Naranbold Gantulga. Craig R. Ramsey waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Renwick, Karen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Naranbold Gantulga. Chris A. Cox waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Renwick, Karen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Naranbold Gantulga. Anthony J. Saich waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Renwick, Karen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Naranbold Gantulga. AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Renwick, Karen)
June 21, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Naranbold Gantulga. Adam M. Aron waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Renwick, Karen)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy W. Brown for Naranbold Gantulga pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/24/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
May 24, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Timothy W. Brown to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4490051.) by Plaintiff Naranbold Gantulga (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Registration form)(Renwick, Karen)
May 21, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
May 21, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Naranbold Gantulga - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Renwick, Karen)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Naranbold Gantulga. (Renwick, Karen)
May 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4486582.), filed by Naranbold Gantulga.(Renwick, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gantulga v. Aron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naranbold Gantulga
Represented By: Karen D. Renwick
Represented By: Timothy W. Brown
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Hill
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lin Zhang
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam M Aron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M Pawlus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J Saich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris A Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maojun Zeng
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary F Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig R Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Q Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard W Koch, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam M. Aron
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M. Pawlus
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Q. Gao
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard W. Koch, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig R. Ramsey
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Saich
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Zhang
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalian Wanda Group Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris A. Cox
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary F. Locke
Represented By: Matthew S. Connors
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Represented By: Joseph M. Rebein
Represented By: John A. Neuwirth
Represented By: Joshua S. Amsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?