Neighbors Investments, Inc. v. Baumgartner et al

Plaintiff: Neighbors Investments, Inc.
Defendant: David G. Baumgartner and The Bank of Versailles
Case Number: 2:2018cv02376
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Pursuant to the order issued by United States District Judge Douglas Harpool from the Western District of Missouri (Doc. 25), this matter is transferred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Kansas. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 7/23/18. (hw)
July 20, 2018 Filing 27 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Neighbors Investments, Inc.. (Johnston, J.)
July 19, 2018 Filing 26 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 2:18-cv-04047. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #11 motion to remand; granting #17 motion to change venue. The Court hereby Orders that this matter be transferred to the United States District court for the District of Kansas pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1412 for referral to the United States Bankruptcy court of the District of Kansas. Signed on 7/10/18 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Case Management Conference scheduled for 6/26/18 11:00 AM has been cancelled. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Howard, Linda) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 motion to stay. The case management conference currently set for 6/26/18 is stayed. The conference will be rescheduled if it is necessary to do so. Signed on 6/18/18 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Siegert, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 23 Consent MOTION to continue Case Management Hearing filed by John Justin Johnston on behalf of Neighbors Investments, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/2/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Johnston, John) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY SUGGESTIONS in support re #17 MOTION to change venue Motion to Transfer Venue REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of Defendants David G. Baumgartner, The Bank of Versailles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Ruskamp, Todd) Modified on 5/18/2018 to modify event (Geiser, Angel). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
May 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to change venue Motion to Transfer Venue. Reply suggestions due by 5/16/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lock, Tania) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #11 MOTION to remand and combined suggestions in opposition to #17 Motion to Transfer Venue filed by John Justin Johnston on behalf of Plaintiff Neighbors Investments, Inc.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Johnston, John) Modified on 5/3/2018 (James, Carrie). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 motion to stay. The deadline for the parties to submit a proposed scheduling order, the Rule 26(f) conference, and MAP referral are hereby stayed pending the Court's ruling on Docs. #11 and #17 . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Guemmer, Jared) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to stay order setting deadline for filing of proposed scheduling order and for Rule 26(f) conference, and to stay mediation assessment program referral filed by John Justin Johnston on behalf of Neighbors Investments, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/11/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Johnston, John) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #17 MOTION to change venue Motion to Transfer Venue, #11 MOTION to remand Combined Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand and in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of Defendants David G. Baumgartner, The Bank of Versailles. Reply suggestions due by 5/2/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #17 , #11 ) (Ruskamp, Todd) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to change venue Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of David G. Baumgartner, The Bank of Versailles. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/2/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ruskamp, Todd) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #11 MOTION to remand Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/18/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Guemmer, Jared) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #11 MOTION to remand Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Remand Motion filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of David G. Baumgartner, The Bank of Versailles. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Ruskamp, Todd) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
April 4, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 NOTICE AND NTOICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/18/2018., Rule 26 conference due by 5/3/2018. Case Management Hearing Conference set for 6/26/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4B, Jefferson City (VDJJC) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Lead counsel for each party shall attend the case management conference. Signed on 4/3/18 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 31, 2018 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Neighbors Investments, Inc. filed by John Justin Johnston on behalf of Plaintiff Neighbors Investments, Inc..(Johnston, John) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 31, 2018 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION to remand filed by John Justin Johnston on behalf of Plaintiff Neighbors Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Claims Register, #2 Exhibit B - Order Confirming Plan of Reorganiztion, #3 Exhibit C - BOV Claim # 9, #4 Exhibit D - BOV Withdrawal of Claim, #5 Exhibit E - Order Granting Application for Final Decree)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Johnston, John) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 31, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to remand filed by John Justin Johnston on behalf of Neighbors Investments, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/16/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Johnston, John) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 motion for leave to file excess pages. Plaintiff may file suggestions not to exceed 25 pages of argument. Signed on 3/30/18 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of David G. Baumgartner, The Bank of Versailles.(Ruskamp, Todd) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by John Justin Johnston on behalf of Neighbors Investments, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Johnston, John) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing of Plaintiff's Statement under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9027(e)(3) by Neighbors Investments, Inc. (Johnston, John) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 motion for extension of time. Defendants' deadline to file their responsive pleadings is March 31, 2018. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Guemmer, Jared) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for extension of time filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ruskamp, Todd) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David G. Baumgartner, The Bank of Versailles re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of Defendants David G. Baumgartner, The Bank of Versailles. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Bank of Versailles, David G. Baumgartner.(Ruskamp, Todd) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS The Bank of Versailles Disclosure of Corporate Interests filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of Defendants David G. Baumgartner, The Bank of Versailles.(Ruskamp, Todd) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(James, Carrie) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Morgan County County, case number 18MG-CC00003, filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of The Bank of Versailles, David G. Baumgartner. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0866-5668269. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ruskamp, Todd) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 7/19/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neighbors Investments, Inc. v. Baumgartner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neighbors Investments, Inc.
Represented By: J. Justin Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Baumgartner
Represented By: Todd W. Ruskamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of Versailles
Represented By: Todd W. Ruskamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?