Young et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Young and Paul Young
Defendant: Linn Star Holdings and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02411
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CANCELLING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: in light of the pending motion to remand to state court (ECF No. 9) and by agreement of the parties, the scheduling conference set for October 11, 2018, is cancelled. The parties are relieved at this time of their obligations to submit initial disclosures and a planning-meeting report. Within five business days of a ruling on plaintiffs' pending motion to remand to state court, the parties are ordered to submit their initial disclosures and planning-meeting report to the undersigned's chambers, unless the case is remanded. Upon receipt, the court will reset the scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/4/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(amh)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Linn Star Holdings re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Meltzer, Hal)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Paul Young, Sharon Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A)(Burns, Michelle)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Paul Young, Sharon Young (Burns, Michelle)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 1:30 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/4/2018. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/27/18. (ss)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying The Home Depot, Inc. as corporate parent . (Meltzer, Hal)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Removal Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Meltzer, Hal)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Removal Complaint by Linn Star Holdings. (Meltzer, Hal)
August 13, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sw)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linn Star Holdings a/k/a Linn Star Transfer, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Meltzer, Hal)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Linn Star Holdings a/k/a Linn Star Transfer, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Meltzer, Hal)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Linn Star Holdings a/k/a Linn Star Transfer, Inc.. (Meltzer, Hal)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 18CV03733 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4554749.), filed by Linn Star Holdings a/k/a Linn Star Transfer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Meltzer, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Young
Represented By: Michelle W. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Young
Represented By: Michelle W. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linn Star Holdings
Represented By: Hal D. Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Hal D. Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?