Young v. Account Recovery Specialists, Inc.
Plaintiff: Seretse Young
Defendant: John Does 1-25 and Account Recovery Specialists, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02419
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Account Recovery Specialists, Inc.(Klutho, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response deadline 10/17/2018) by Defendant Account Recovery Specialists, Inc. (Klutho, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 09/26/2018 for Defendant Account Recovery Specialists, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/11/2018. (ca)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Account Recovery Specialists, Inc. (Klutho, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael A. Klutho on behalf of Account Recovery Specialists, Inc. (Klutho, Michael)
August 14, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Account Recovery Specialists, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (tvn)
August 14, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Seretse Young. (Williston, Keith)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4555492.), filed by Seretse Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williston, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Account Recovery Specialists, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Account Recovery Specialists, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Klutho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seretse Young
Represented By: Keith N. Williston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?