Butcher et al v. Teamsters Local 955 et al

Plaintiff: Jeremy Butcher and Jeremy Butcher, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1-5 and Teamsters Local 955
Case Number: 2:2018cv02424
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
0 Judge: Kenneth G Gale
1 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Teamsters Local 955 re: #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Amash, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Jeremy Butcher, Jeremy Butcher, Inc. re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Teamsters Local 955 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Amash, Michael)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Teamsters Local 955 (Amash, Michael)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955 (Amash, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Jeremy Butcher, Jeremy Butcher, Inc. upon Teamsters Local 955 served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018 (Kapke, George)
August 22, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Does 1-5, Teamsters Local 955. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (tvn)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Butcher - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Kapke, George)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JEREMY BUTCHER identifying Jeremy Butcher, Inc. as corporate parent . (Kapke, George)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff JEREMY BUTCHER. (Kapke, George)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4558258.), filed by JEREMY BUTCHER, JEREMY BUTCHER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kapke, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butcher et al v. Teamsters Local 955 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 955
Represented By: Michael Amash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Butcher
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Represented By: John M. Klamann
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew J. Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Butcher, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Represented By: John M. Klamann
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew J. Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?