Andrewjeski v. Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jason Andrewjeski
Defendant: Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, Teamsters Local 955, John Does 1-5 and Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02425
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
0 Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
1 Judge: John W Lungstrum
2 Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Teamsters Local 955 re: #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Amash, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jason Andrewjeski re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Teamsters Local 955 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Amash, Michael)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Teamsters Local 955 (Amash, Michael)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955 (Amash, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Jason Andrewjeski upon Teamsters Local 955 served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018 (Kapke, George)
August 22, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, John Does 1-5, Teamsters Local 955. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (tvn)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Lungstrum no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/17/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kao)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jason Andrewjeski. (Kapke, George)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4558682.), filed by Jason Andrewjeski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kapke, George)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Jason Andrewjeski - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Kapke, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrewjeski v. Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 955
Represented By: Michael Amash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Andrewjeski
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Represented By: John M. Klamann
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew J. Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?