Ansa v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Misganu T. Ansa
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv02426
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 SURREPLY by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Kelly, Bryan)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE #15 FOR CORRECT FILING.***SURREPLY by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re: #12 MOTION for Leave to file Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court (Kelly, Bryan) Modified on 10/9/2018 (tvn).
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Defendant may file a surreply, but this ruling should not be considered a determinative ruling on whether the arguments raised in the surreply are properly before the court. When the court considers plaintiff's Motion to Remand, it will disregard any arguments in the surreply that are not properly before the court. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/3/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (wkn)
September 20, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #12 MOTION for Leave to file Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
September 20, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to file Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Kelly, Bryan)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: In light of the pending #8 Motion to Remand, the Court sets a Status Conference instead of a Scheduling Conference on 10/24/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. The Conference will be held by telephone. COUNSEL WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/18/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Misganu T. Ansa re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Adams, David) Modified on 9/18/2018 to correct event type (tvn).
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bryan R Kelly, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Kelly, Bryan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Misganu T. Ansa (Adams, David)
August 17, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Kelly on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Kelly, Bryan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company identifying None as corporate parent . (Sanders, James)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Sanders, James)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Sanders, James)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Wyandotte County. (Sanders, James)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Sanders, James)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County District Court, case number 2018-CV-000513 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4560084.), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Sanders, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ansa v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: James L. Sanders
Represented By: Bryan Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misganu T. Ansa
Represented By: David S. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?