Sword v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Plaintiff: Stanley Sword
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and Health and Welfare Plans
Case Number: 2:2018cv02439
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
1 Judge: Teresa J James
2 Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 12 Featured Case INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 01:30 PM in KC Courtroom 236 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Meeting and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 11/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/2/2018. (ts)
October 2, 2018 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Cigna Corporation as corporate parent . (Leopold, Christopher)
October 2, 2018 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Leopold, Christopher)
September 19, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America is hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including October 2, 2018, in which to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/19/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 18, 2018 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hanna, William)
September 13, 2018 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William E. Hanna on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Hanna, William)
September 11, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 09/11/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
September 10, 2018 5 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL as to Defendant Health and Welfare Plans Only by Health and Welfare Plans, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanna, William)
September 4, 2018 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Stanley Sword upon Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018 (Ravis, Talia)
August 29, 2018 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- certified mail by Stanley Sword upon Health and Welfare Plans served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018 (Ravis, Talia)
August 24, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Health and Welfare Plans, Life Insurance Company of North America. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (tvn)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
August 24, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Stanley Sword. (Ravis, Talia)
August 24, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4565367.), filed by Stanley Sword.(Ravis, Talia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sword v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Christopher J. Leopold
Represented By: William E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health and Welfare Plans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Sword
Represented By: Talia B. Ravis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?