Albers v. Seterus, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carrie Albers
Defendant: Seterus, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02440
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
2 Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Carlos Murguia recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/1/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Seterus, Inc. to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading due 10/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/28/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Seterus, Inc. identifying Kyanite Services, Inc. as corporate parent (Fitts, Amy)
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Seterus, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Fitts, Amy)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Asa Covington Edwards, IV for Carrie Albers pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/12/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Scott C. Harris for Carrie Albers pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/12/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Asa C. Edwards IV to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4581093.) by Plaintiff Carrie Albers (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Envelope Affidavit & Registration)(Boswell, Brittany)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Scott C. Harris to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4580845.) by Plaintiff Carrie Albers (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Envelope Affidavit & Registration)(Boswell, Brittany)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patrick M. Wallace as counsel for Carrie Albers pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/10/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
September 9, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Patrick Matthew Wallace to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4578014.) by Plaintiff Carrie Albers (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Envelope Affidavit & Registration)(Boswell, Brittany)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Mitchell M. Breit as counsel for Carrie Albers pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/29/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for attorney Mitchell M. Breit to appear pro hac vice by Plaintiff Carrie Albers (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Envelope Affidavit & Registration)(Boswell, Brittany)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying, without prejudice, #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4. Corrected motion to be filed by local counsel. Pro hac vice fee has been paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/29/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Mitchell M. Breit to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4569410.) by Plaintiff Carrie Albers (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Envelope Affidavit & Registration)(Boswell, Brittany)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Carrie Albers - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Boswell, Brittany)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Carrie Albers. (Boswell, Brittany)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4565516.), filed by Carrie Albers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Boswell, Brittany)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
August 24, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Seterus, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (hw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albers v. Seterus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Albers
Represented By: Brittany Boswell
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Patrick M. Wallace
Represented By: Asa Covington Edwards, IV
Represented By: Brittany A. Boswell
Represented By: Scott C. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus, Inc.
Represented By: Amy D. Fitts
Represented By: Russell S. Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?