Bailey v. Bury the Hatchet KC et al
Plaintiff: Keely Bailey
Defendant: Bury the Hatchet KC, Bury the Hatchet Holdings, LLC, Bury the Hatchet LLC and Bury the Hatchet OP, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02441
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
2 Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Bury the Hatchet KC, LLC is hereby granted an extension of time, to and including 11/13/2018, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/14/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Bury the Hatchet KC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (McPherson, Brendan)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Certified Mail by Keely Bailey upon Bury the Hatchet KC served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018 (Ziegelmeyer, John)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Keely Bailey. Bury the Hatchet Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 9/11/2018, answer due 11/13/2018; Bury the Hatchet LLC waiver sent on 9/11/2018, answer due 11/13/2018; Bury the Hatchet OP, LLC waiver sent on 9/11/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Ziegelmeyer, John)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/27/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Keely Bailey - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Ziegelmeyer, John)
August 24, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bury the Hatchet Holdings, LLC, Bury the Hatchet KC, Bury the Hatchet LLC, Bury the Hatchet OP, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (hw)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Keely Bailey. (Ziegelmeyer, John)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4565543.), filed by Keely Bailey.(Ziegelmeyer, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Bury the Hatchet KC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bury the Hatchet KC
Represented By: Brendan McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bury the Hatchet Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bury the Hatchet LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bury the Hatchet OP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keely Bailey
Represented By: John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?