Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Frantz et al

Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Patrick C. Frantz and Barbara Frantz
Case Number: 2:2018cv02469
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patrick C. Frantz. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by Primerica Life Insurance Company as to Patrick C. Frantz. (Higgins, Angela)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Response to Complaint Received From Defendant Pro Se Barbara Frantz Not Apparently Filed with the Court by Primerica Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint (attorney) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response of Defendant Pro Se Barbara Frantz to Complaint)(Higgins, Angela)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Primerica Life Insurance Company upon Barbara Frantz served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018 (Kreamer, James) Modified on 9/25/2018 to correct the name of person being served (hw).
September 11, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barbara Frantz, Patrick C. Frantz. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Primerica Life Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Higgins, Angela)
August 30, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sw)
August 30, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sw)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Primerica Life Insurance Company identifying Primerica, Inc. as corporate parent . (Higgins, Angela)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4571432.), filed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex Civil Cover Sheet)(Higgins, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Frantz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick C. Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela M. Higgins
Represented By: James S. Kreamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?