Hancock v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.

Plaintiff: Curtis Hancock
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02472
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Melissa L. Steed on behalf of Curtis Hancock. (Steed, Melissa)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Good Faith Settlement Proposal by Curtis Hancock. (Steed, Melissa)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 Amended NOTICE by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. of taking deposition of Curtis Hancock and Sandra Hancock on November 16, 2018 (Beever, Jessica) (Modified on 10/19/2018 to correct title. (hl))
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. of taking deposition of Curtis Hancock and Sandra Hancock on November 12, 2018 (Beever, Jessica)
October 8, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Defendant's Rule 26 Disclosures by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Beever, Jessica)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/18/2018. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/20/18. (ss)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORDS from Wyandotte County District Court. (Beever, Jessica)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORDS from Wyandotte County District Court. (Beever, Jessica)
August 31, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. of First Interrogatories and First Request for Production. (Beever, Jessica)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. identifying None as corporate parent. (Beever, Jessica)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.(Beever, Jessica)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Beever, Jessica)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Beever, Jessica)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, case number 2018-CV-000612; Trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4572914.), filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition)(Beever, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Jessica R. Beever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Hancock
Represented By: Ronald L. Edelman
Represented By: Melissa L. Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?