Sudenga Industries Inc v. Global Industries Inc

Plaintiff: Sudenga Industries, Inc
Defendant: Global Industries, Inc. and Ag Growth International Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv02498
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 51 ANSWER to #46 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Sudenga Industries, Inc.(Dodig, Michael)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/30/2018. (amh)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/30/2018. (amh)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 INITIAL PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/30/2018. (amh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 47 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 10/30/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Scheduling Order will subsequently be filed). (yh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 46 AMENDED ANSWER to #37 Amended Complaint, SECOND AMENDED FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT, COUNTERCLAIM against Sudenga Industries, Inc by Global Industries, Inc. (Heidrick, Jay)
October 12, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER to #37 Amended Complaint, SECOND AMENDED FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT, COUNTERCLAIM against Sudenga Industries, Inc by Global Industries, Inc..(Heidrick, Jay) Modified Document Security on 10/12/2018- Attorney attached incorrect document. (sw).
October 5, 2018 Filing 44 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jay E. Heidrick on behalf of Global Industries, Inc. (Heidrick, Jay)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew L. Cutler for Global Industries, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/2/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Douglas A. Robinson for Global Industries, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/2/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
October 1, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for attorney Matthew L. Cutler to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4596699.) by Defendant Global Industries, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Sear, Timothy)
October 1, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for attorney Douglas A. Robinson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4596685.) by Defendant Global Industries, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Sear, Timothy) Modified on 10/1/2018 (sw).
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Austen Zuege for Sudenga Industries, Inc pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/28/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
September 28, 2018 Filing 38 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Keith J. Grady on behalf of Global Industries, Inc. (Grady, Keith)
September 28, 2018 Filing 37 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Global Industries, Inc., filed by Sudenga Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - '823 Patent, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - '000 Patent, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - '001 Patent, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - '338 Patent, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Kipp email April2017, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Kipp email Feb2018)(Dodig, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 36 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Timothy J. Sear on behalf of Global Industries, Inc. (Sear, Timothy)
September 28, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Pleadings by Sudenga Industries, Inc re #33 Stipulation, #34 Amended Complaint, #31 MOTION for attorney Austen Phillip Zuege to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4594645.), #32 Notice of Related Case, #30 Entry of Appearance. (Dodig, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 34 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sudenga Industries, Inc, filed by Sudenga Industries, Inc.(Dodig, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION OF CONSENT TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Sudenga Industries, Inc. (Dodig, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE: Case Number 5:18-cv-04026 by Sudenga Industries, Inc (Dodig, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for attorney Austen Phillip Zuege to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4594645.) by Plaintiff Sudenga Industries, Inc (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration)(Dodig, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 30 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Dodig on behalf of Sudenga Industries, Inc. (Dodig, Michael)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 at 1:30 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/16/2018. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/16/2018. A copy of the initial order regarding planning and scheduling was e-mailed to Daniel E. DeKoter, Austen P. Zuege, Jeana L. Goosmann, William J. Hale, Douglas A. Robinson, and Matthew L. Cutler. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/18/18. (ss)
September 14, 2018 Filing 28 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw)
September 14, 2018 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Iowa Northern; Case Number 5:18-cv-04024. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
September 14, 2018 Filing 26 DOCKET Annotation: AO 120 Form mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (des) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
September 14, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #25 Order. Clerk electronically transmitted case to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. (des) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 Motion to Dismiss for improper venue or, alternatively, to transfer venue. The motion is denied as to the request for dismissal but granted as to the alternative request to transfer venue to the District of Kansas. The Clerk shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 9/14/2018. (des) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Magistrate Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Global Industries Inc. (Robinson, Douglas) (Main Document 24 replaced on 8/14/2018 with corrected version) (src) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 23 BRIEF in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Sudenga Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (DeKoter, Daniel) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Defendant Global Industries Inc Responses due by 8/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #2 Exhibit A - Iowa Data Table, #3 Exhibit B - Kansas Data Table, #4 Exhibit C - Selected Terms, #5 Declaration Ryan Kipp, #6 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Reinstatement, #7 Exhibit 2 - Listing Agreement) (Robinson, Douglas) Modified on 7/24/2018 to edit text. (src) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #20 Motion for Extension of Time of LR 16 Deadline for Submission of Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Sudenga Industries, Inc: Scheduling Report due by 9/11/2018 or, on the dates proposed in the joint #20 Motion if the Court rules on the venue motion within the next 60 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 07/13/2018. (jjh) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines of LR 16 Deadline for Submission of Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Sudenga Industries, Inc (DeKoter, Daniel) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Ag Growth International Inc., by Sudenga Industries, Inc. (DeKoter, Daniel) Modified on 7/11/2018 to edit text. (src) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 18 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Global Industries Inc (Hale, William) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Douglas Alan Robinson and #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Lawrence Cutler on behalf of Defendant Global Industries Inc. CM/ECF Registration due by 7/5/2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 06/21/2018. (eRobinson, eCutler w/CM/ECF form) (jjh) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Lawrence Cutler ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2718584) by Defendant Global Industries Inc (Goosmann, Jeana) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Douglas Alan Robinson ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2718575) by Defendant Global Industries Inc (Goosmann, Jeana) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline extended for Global Industries Inc to 7/23/2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 6/20/2018. (pac) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeana L Goosmann on behalf of Global Industries Inc. (Goosmann, Jeana) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Austen Zuege on behalf of Plaintiff Sudenga Industries, Inc. CMECF registration due by 7/2/2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 6/18/2018 (eZuege). (skm) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Global Industries Inc (Hale, William) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jeremiah Hale on behalf of Global Industries Inc. (Hale, William) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Austen Zuege ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2716285) by Plaintiff Sudenga Industries, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (DeKoter, Daniel) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 8 STATUS Report by Sudenga Industries, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hague Convention Service Form) (DeKoter, Daniel) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/1/2018. Action taken per #7 . (src) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff Sudenga Industries Inc: Defendant Global Industries Inc served on 06/01/2018: Answer ddl 06/22/2018 (DeKoter, Daniel) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 6 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re #5 Amended Complaint Regarding a Patent or Trademark. AO 120 mailed to Director or the U.S. Patent & Trademark Office. (src) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand For Patent Infringement against Ag Growth International Inc, filed by Sudenga Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) Associated Cases: 5:18-cv-04024-LTS, 5:18-cv-04026-LTS (DeKoter, Daniel) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
March 19, 2018 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand: Judge Mark W Bennett no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (Action taken pursuant to MWB chambers) (kfs) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 4 AO 120 mailed to Mail Stop 8 Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (src) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ag Growth International Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (src) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Judge Mark W Bennett and Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams added. No conflicts identified with parties, attorney DeKoter, MWB and CJW. Also, no conflicts identified re LR 7.1 by plaintiff at docket no. #2 . (src) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sudenga Industries Inc (DeKoter, Daniel) [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Ag Growth International Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2655849.), filed by Sudenga Industries Inc. Scheduling Report due by 6/11/2018 (DeKoter, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (des). [Transferred from Iowa Northern on 9/14/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sudenga Industries Inc v. Global Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew L. Cutler
Represented By: Jay E. Heidrick
Represented By: Timothy J. Sear
Represented By: Keith J. Grady
Represented By: Douglas A. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ag Growth International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sudenga Industries, Inc
Represented By: Michael S. Dodig
Represented By: Austen Zuege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?