Roberts v. Midland Funding LLC
Plaintiff: Douglas Roberts
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02504
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosures by Douglas Roberts. (Callahan, Ryan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's initial disclosures by Midland Funding LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James Crump on behalf of Douglas Roberts. (Crump, James)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel shall dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 4901386 to join the conference. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 11/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/1/2018. (mn)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Removal Complaint by Midland Funding LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORDS from Johnson County District Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Dickinson, Joshua)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Midland Funding LLC . (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Notice to State Court)(Dickinson, Joshua)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midland Funding LLC identifying Encore Capital Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Dickinson, Joshua)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal, to Plaintiff by Midland Funding LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Dickinson, Joshua)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Midland Funding LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson County District Court, case number 18CV04541 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4587961.), filed by Midland Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - State Court Action)(Dickinson, Joshua)
September 20, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Kersten L. Holzhueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Roberts
Represented By: Ryan M. Callahan
Represented By: James Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?