Buck Box, et al v. United States of America, et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Box, Renee Box, Stephanie Box and Buck R. Box
Defendant: Community Health Center of Southeast Kansas, Inc., United States, United States Department of Health & Human Services, APRN Michael Forbes, Mercy Hospital Columbus, Bret Michael Bullard, United States of America and Michael Forbes
Case Number: 2:2018cv02517
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of proof of service by Anthony Box, Buck R. Box, Renee Box, Stephanie Box. (Spigarelli, Kala)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Bret Michael Bullard, Mercy Hospital Columbus.(Wray, Trevin)
November 6, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bret Michael Bullard, Mercy Hospital Columbus. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Community Health Center of Southeast Kansas, Inc., Michael Forbes, United States Department of Health & Human Services, United States of America, filed by Anthony Box, Stephanie Box, Renee Box, Buck R. Box.(Spigarelli, Kala)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Anthony Box, Stephanie Box, Renee Box, Buck R. Box upon Michael Forbes served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018 Spigarelli, Kala (Spigarelli, Kala)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 10/10/2018 Spigarelli, Kala (Spigarelli, Kala)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 10/5/2018 Summons served on United States Attorney General. Spigarelli, Kala (Spigarelli, Kala)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 10/4/2018 Summons served on United States Attorney's Office. Spigarelli, Kala (Spigarelli, Kala)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 10/1/2018 United States Department of Health & Human Services served on 10/1/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. Summons served on United States Attorney. Spigarelli, Kala (Spigarelli, Kala)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 10/3/2018 Summons served on United States Attorney General. Spigarelli, Kala (Spigarelli, Kala)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 10/1/2018 United States of America served on 10/1/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. Summons served on United States Attorney. Spigarelli, Kala (Spigarelli, Kala)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Anthony Box, Stephanie Box, Renee Box, Buck R. Box upon Community Health Center of Southeast Kansas, Inc. served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018 Spigarelli, Kala (Spigarelli, Kala)
September 27, 2018 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, (issued to Attorney for service). (ca)
September 26, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Health & Human Services, United States of America and U.S. Attorney, and Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service). (ca) Modified on 9/27/2018 to add that summons were also issued to the Attorney General.(ca)
September 26, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Community Health Center of Southeast Kansas, Inc., Michael Forbes. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
September 26, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Anthony Box, Buck R. Box, Renee Box, Stephanie Box. (Spigarelli, Kala)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4592754.), filed by Anthony Box, Stephanie Box, Renee Box, Buck R. Box.(Spigarelli, Kala)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck Box, et al v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Center of Southeast Kansas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APRN Michael Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Hospital Columbus
Represented By: Trevin E. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Michael Bullard
Represented By: Trevin E. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Box
Represented By: Kala A. Spigarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Box
Represented By: Kala A. Spigarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Box
Represented By: Kala A. Spigarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buck R. Box
Represented By: Kala A. Spigarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?