Thrivent Financial for Lutherans v. Fitch et al
Plaintiff: Thrivent Financial for Lutherans
Defendant: Ted J. Fitch and John Crane
Case Number: 2:2018cv02542
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Ted J. Fitch(Putative Trustee of the Roberta L. Crane-Fitch Trust), Ted J. Fitch(Individually).(Soltz, Edwin)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by defendants Ted J. Fitch(Putative Trustee of the Roberta L. Crane-Fitch Trust) and Ted J. Fitch(Individually) waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Soltz, Edwin) (Modified on 11/9/2018 to correct docket text; incorrect ecf event used. (hl))
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Edwin M. Soltz on behalf of Ted J. Fitch(Putative Trustee of the Roberta L. Crane-Fitch Trust), Ted J. Fitch(Individually). (Soltz, Edwin)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans. John Crane waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Brunkhorst, Matthew)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans identifying None as corporate parent . (Brunkhorst, Matthew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Thrivent Financial for Lutherans - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Brunkhorst, Matthew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Thrivent Financial for Lutherans. (Brunkhorst, Matthew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4604554.), filed by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Variable Annuity Application, #3 Exhibit C - Death Certificate, #4 Exhibit D - Email to Thrivent, #5 Exhibit E - July 11, 2018 Letter to John Crane, #6 Exhibit F - July 11, 2018 Letter to Ted Fitch, #7 Exhibit G - July 26, 2018 Letter, #8 Exhibit H - July 30, 2018 Letter, #9 Exhibit I - July 30, 2018 from J. Crane Attorney, #10 Exhibit J - Beneficiary Statement)(Brunkhorst, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrivent Financial for Lutherans v. Fitch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted J. Fitch
Represented By: Edwin M. Soltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thrivent Financial for Lutherans
Represented By: Matthew R. Brunkhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?