Penner v. American Cancer Society, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Penner
Defendant: American Cancer Society, Inc. Retirement Annuity Plan and American Cancer Society, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02565
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by American Cancer Society, Inc., American Cancer Society, Inc. Retirement Annuity Plan.(Runion, Shelley)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 consent motion for extension of time until December 20, 2018, for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants American Cancer Society, Inc., American Cancer Society, Inc. Retirement Annuity Plan (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Runion, Shelley)
October 22, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Cancer Society, Inc., American Cancer Society, Inc. Retirement Annuity Plan. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
October 22, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR. DESIGNATION WAS IN THE COMPLAINT.*** NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) Modified on 10/22/2018 (ca).
October 22, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4613748.), filed by Michael Penner. (Attachments: #1 civil coversheet)(Ravis, Talia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penner v. American Cancer Society, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Penner
Represented By: Talia B. Ravis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cancer Society, Inc. Retirement Annuity Plan
Represented By: Shelley A. Runion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cancer Society, Inc.
Represented By: Shelley A. Runion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?