Nekouee v. Net Lease Funding 2005, LP

Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Defendant: Net Lease Funding 2005, LP
Case Number: 2:2018cv02589
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Net Lease Funding 2005, LP.(Richardson, William)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 unopposed motion for extension of time until December 20, 2018, for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/4/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Net Lease Funding 2005, LP identifying Vereit Operating Partnership, L.P.; VEREIT, Inc. as corporate parent . (Richardson, William)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Net Lease Funding 2005, LP. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Richardson, William)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Certified Mail by Fred Nekouee upon Net Lease Funding 2005, LP served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Vincze, Robert)
November 5, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Net Lease Funding 2005, LP. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 5, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee. (Vincze, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4625527.), filed by Fred Nekouee.(Vincze, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nekouee v. Net Lease Funding 2005, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Net Lease Funding 2005, LP
Represented By: William Clark Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Represented By: Robert J. Vincze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?