Freedom Transportation, Inc. v. Navistar International Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Freedom Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing, Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Penske Logistics LLC, Allstate Fleet and Equipment Sales of Houston, Inc., Navistar, Inc. and Navistar International Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv02602
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. (Patterson, John)
January 4, 2019 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Fleet and Equipment Sales of Houston, Inc. (Gosserand, Anthony)
January 4, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim and Failure to Plead Fraud Claims with Particularity by Defendant Allstate Fleet and Equipment Sales of Houston, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1")(Gosserand, Anthony)
January 4, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim and Failure to Plead Fraud Claims with Particularity by Defendant Allstate Fleet and Equipment Sales of Houston, Inc. (Gosserand, Anthony)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) #13 and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) #24 . Plaintiff's response deadline for both Motions to Dismiss is extended to 2/4/2019. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 12/27/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lml)
December 26, 2018 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) by Plaintiff Freedom Transportation, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Budden, Richard)
December 21, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Penske Truck Leasing, Co., L.P. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Glenn Declaration)(Geary, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Penske Truck Leasing, Co., L.P. (Geary, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Penske Truck Leasing, Co., L.P. . (Geary, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Penske Logistics LLC identifying Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. as corporate parent . (Geary, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Penske Truck Leasing Corporation . (Geary, Matthew)
December 14, 2018 Filing 20 ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- PERSONAL SERVICE by Freedom Transportation, Inc. upon Allstate Fleet and Equipment Sales of Houston, Inc. served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019 (Budden, Richard) (Additional attachment added on 12/18/2018 due to violation of privacy policy: #1 Redacted Main Document) (hl).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Luke C. Spencer for Navistar International Corporation and Navistar, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/14/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey S. Patterson for Navistar International Corporation and Navistar, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/14/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Angela M. Higgins on behalf of Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. (Higgins, Angela)
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Luke C. Spencer to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4660776.) by Defendants Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of PHV Motion, #2 PHV ECF Registration Form)(Patterson, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Jeffrey S. Patterson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4660728.) by Defendants Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of PHV Motion, #2 ECF Registration Form PHV ECF Registration Form)(Patterson, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) by Defendants Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Patterson, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) by Defendants Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. (Patterson, John)
December 13, 2018 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Fleet and Equipment Sales of Houston, Inc. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by Freedom Transportation, Inc. as to Allstate Fleet and Equipment Sales of Houston, Inc.. (Budden, Richard)
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/21/2018 for Defendants Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing, Co., L.P. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/06/2018. (ca)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Freedom Transportation, Inc. upon Navistar International Corporation served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/14/2018 (Budden, Richard)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Freedom Transportation, Inc. upon Penske Logistics LLC served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018 (Budden, Richard)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Freedom Transportation, Inc. upon Penske Truck Leasing Corporation served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018 (Budden, Richard)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Freedom Transportation, Inc. upon Penske Truck Leasing, Co., L.P. served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018 (Budden, Richard)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Freedom Transportation, Inc. upon Navistar, Inc. served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/14/2018 (Budden, Richard)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/14/2018 for Defendants Navistar, Inc., Navistar International Corporation to answer or otherwise plead Signed by deputy clerk on 11/28/2018. (ca)
November 9, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Fleet and Equipment Sales of Houston, Inc., Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Penske Truck Leasing, Co., L.P.. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 9, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Freedom Transportation - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Budden, Richard)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Freedom Transportation identifying NA as corporate parent . (Budden, Richard)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Freedom Transportation. (Budden, Richard)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4630924.), filed by Freedom Transportation.(Budden, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Transportation, Inc. v. Navistar International Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing, Co., L.P.
Represented By: Patrick Kevin McMonigle
Represented By: Matthew W. Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Corporation
Represented By: Patrick Kevin McMonigle
Represented By: Matthew W. Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Logistics LLC
Represented By: Patrick Kevin McMonigle
Represented By: Matthew W. Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fleet and Equipment Sales of Houston, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Gosserand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Patterson
Represented By: Luke C. Spencer
Represented By: John E. Patterson
Represented By: James T. Seigfreid, Jr.
Represented By: Angela M. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar International Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Patterson
Represented By: Luke C. Spencer
Represented By: John E. Patterson
Represented By: James T. Seigfreid, Jr.
Represented By: Angela M. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Budden
Represented By: Daniel A. Singer
Represented By: Scott E. Nutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?