Sullivan v. Adventist Healthe Systems et al

Plaintiff: Scott B. Sullivan
Defendant: Shawnee Mission Primary Care, Shawnee Mission Medical Center, Adventist Healthe Systems, New Haven Seventh-Day Adventist Church, Neurosurgery Associates, General Conference Corporation of Seventh-Day Adventists and Adventist Health Systems
Case Number: 2:2018cv02606
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Teresa J James
1 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document Summons Issued, mailed to Scott B. Sullivan on 1/3/2019 by regular mail. (ca)
January 3, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adventist Health Systems, General Conference Corporation of Seventh-Day Adventists, Neurosurgery Associates, New Haven Seventh-Day Adventist Church, Shawnee Mission Medical Center, Shawnee Mission Primary Care. (issued to US Marshal for service USM 285) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (in forma pauperis). Plaintiff shall provide complete address information for each Defendant named in the Complaint to the Clerk's office no later than January 3, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/18/2018. Mailed to pro se party Scott B. Sullivan by regular mail. (ts)
November 9, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
November 9, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan. (ca)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Scott B. Sullivan.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Adventist Healthe Systems et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnee Mission Primary Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnee Mission Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventist Healthe Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Haven Seventh-Day Adventist Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neurosurgery Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Conference Corporation of Seventh-Day Adventists
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventist Health Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott B. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?