Flerlage et al v. US Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Markus Murray and Margaret Flerlage
Defendant: US Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02614
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joan B. Tucker Fife and #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew B. Seipel for US Foods, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hl)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Matthew B. Seipel to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4675467.) by Defendant US Foods, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice)(Sturdivan, Sean)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Joan B. Tucker Fife to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4675435.) by Defendant US Foods, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice)(Sturdivan, Sean)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant is granted a 30-day extension of time, to and including January 17, 2019, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/27/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant US Foods, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Sturdivan, Sean)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCUMENT INCORRECTLY FILED*** STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Initial Complaint by US Foods, Inc. (Sturdivan, Sean) (Modified on 12/20/2018 to block document; document incorrectly filed. Attorney was contacted to advise of appropriate procedure to request clerk's extension. (hl))
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCUMENT INCORRECTLY FILED*** STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs Initial Complaint by Margaret Flerlage, Markus Murray. (Osman, Matthew) (Modified on 12/19/2018 to block from public view per TJJ chambers; document incorrectly filed. (hl))
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Certified Mail by Markus Murray, Margaret Flerlage upon US Foods, Inc. served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Evidence of Service)(Osman, Matthew)
November 20, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Foods, Inc.. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Margaret Flerlage, Markus Murray - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Osman, Matthew)
November 16, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 16, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Margaret Flerlage, Markus Murray. (Osman, Matthew)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4636556.), filed by Markus Murray, Margaret Flerlage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Flerlage CTJ, #2 Exhibit B - Murray CTJ)(Osman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flerlage et al v. US Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Sean M. Sturdivan
Represented By: Joan B. Tucker Fife
Represented By: Matthew B. Seipel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markus Murray
Represented By: Matthew Edward Osman
Represented By: Kathryn J. Starrett Rickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Flerlage
Represented By: Matthew Edward Osman
Represented By: Kathryn J. Starrett Rickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?