Flaherty v. Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC
Plaintiff: Jeremy Flaherty
Defendant: Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02627
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 2/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/19/18. (alm)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC identifying ARC Holdings, LLC as corporate parent (Porto, Anthony)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC.(Porto, Anthony)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Jeremy Flaherty. (Stecklein, Alan)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/14/2018 for Defendant Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC to answer or otherwise plead Signed by deputy clerk on 11/30/2018. (ca)
November 20, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 EXHIBIT A to #1 Notice of Removal. (Porto, Anthony) Modified title on 11/20/2018. (kao)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Porto, Anthony)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC. (Porto, Anthony)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County District Court, case number 2018-LM-005110 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4640601.), filed by Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC.(Porto, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flaherty v. Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Resolutions Investment LLC
Represented By: Anthony F. Porto, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Flaherty
Represented By: Alan J. Stecklein
Represented By: Matthew Robertson
Represented By: Michael H. Rapp
Represented By: Matthew S. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?