Nekouee v. HRA Fountains, LP et al

Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Defendant: HRA Fountains, LP, Cheesecake Restaurants of Kansas LLC, The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The and Cheesecake Factory Restaurants of Kansas LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02628
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: James P O'Hara
1 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER granting #11 unopposed motion for extension of time until February 5, 2019, for defendants Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. and Cheesecake Factory Restaurants of Kansas, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. As this is the third extension granted, no further extensions will be permitted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
January 17, 2019 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants Cheesecake Factory Restaurants of Kansas LLC, Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Hershewe, Anne)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER granting #9 unopposed motion for extension of time until January 22, 2019, for defendants Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. and Cheesecake Factory Restaurants of Kansas, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
January 3, 2019 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants Cheesecake Factory Restaurants of Kansas LLC, Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Hershewe, Anne)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER granting #7 unopposed motion for extension of time until January 7, 2019, for defendants Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. and Cheesecake Factory Restaurants of Kansas, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/13/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
December 13, 2018 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants Cheesecake Factory Restaurants of Kansas LLC, Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Hershewe, Anne)
December 3, 2018 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Certified Mail by Fred Nekouee upon Cheesecake Factory Restaurants of Kansas LLC served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018 (Vincze, Robert)
December 3, 2018 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Certified Mail by Fred Nekouee upon Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Vincze, Robert)
December 3, 2018 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Certified Mail by Fred Nekouee upon HRA Fountains, LP served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Vincze, Robert)
November 21, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cheesecake Factory Restaurants of Kansas LLC, Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The, HRA Fountains, LP. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (tvn)
November 21, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
November 21, 2018 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against HRA Fountains, LP, The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., Cheesecake Factory Restaurants of Kansas LLC, filed by Fred Nekouee.(Vincze, Robert)
November 20, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee. (Vincze, Robert)
November 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4640765.), filed by Fred Nekouee.(Vincze, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nekouee v. HRA Fountains, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRA Fountains, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheesecake Restaurants of Kansas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The
Represented By: Anne L. Hershewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheesecake Factory Restaurants of Kansas LLC
Represented By: Anne L. Hershewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Represented By: Robert J. Vincze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?