Mylan, Inc. et al v Justin Works
Petitioner: Justin Works
Respondent: Mylan Specialty, LP and Mylan Inc.
In Re: Epipen
Case Number: 2:2018cv02637
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion by Non-Party Justin Works and Mylan for Two-Day Extension of Deposition Deadline. The Court extends the deadline for the deposition of non-party Justin Works until January 17, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/7/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
January 4, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for extension of time until January 17, 2019 for deposition of Justin Works by Respondents Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Friedman, Lee)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #1 Non-Party Justin Works' Motion to Quash Subpoena. The deadline for the deposition of Justin Works is extended until January 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/21/2018. (ts)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Philip A. Sechler for Mylan Inc., and Mylan Specialty, LP pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/07/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Philip A. Sechler to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4654266.) by Respondents Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip A. Sechler)(Fries, Brian)
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian C. Fries on behalf of Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty, LP. (Fries, Brian)
November 27, 2018 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Chad C. Beaver on behalf of Justin Works. (Beaver, Chad)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson, Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/26/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kao)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:18-mc-00107. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
November 16, 2018 Case will be sent to District of Kansas by electronic case transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. If case is stipulated, the 15 day waiting period does not apply. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Transfer Case signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The unopposed motion to transfer is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Philip A. Sechler by Interested Parties Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P. re #6 MOTION to Seal Its Consent to Justin Work's Motion to Transfer and Brief in Opposition to his Motion to Quash Subpoena, #9 Declaration, (Perez, David) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Philip A. Sechler by Interested Parties Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P. re #6 MOTION to Seal Its Consent to Justin Work's Motion to Transfer and Brief in Opposition to his Motion to Quash Subpoena, #9 Declaration, (Perez, David) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Philip A. Sechler filed by Interested Parties Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P. re #6 MOTION to Seal Its Consent to Justin Work's Motion to Transfer and Brief in Opposition to his Motion to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13)(Perez, David) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT Consent to Justin Work's Motion to Transfer and Brief in Opposition to his motion to Quash Subpoena by Interested Parties Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P. re #6 MOTION to Seal Its Consent to Justin Work's Motion to Transfer and Brief in Opposition to his Motion to Quash Subpoena, #1 MOTION to Quash, #2 MOTION to Transfer Case (Perez, David) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE, by Interested Parties Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P., to #1 MOTION to Quash, #2 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perez, David) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Its Consent to Justin Work's Motion to Transfer and Brief in Opposition to his Motion to Quash Subpoena, filed by Interested Parties Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/16/2018, (Perez, David) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
November 7, 2018 Noting Date Set/Reset re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case : Noting Date 11/16/2018, (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
October 30, 2018 Noting Date Set/Reset re #1 MOTION to Quash : Noting Date 11/16/2018. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
October 30, 2018 MINUTE ENTRY: This case was incorrectly opened as a Civil Case. It has now been reassigned a Miscellaneous Case number. All future pleadings must bear the newly assigned Miscellaneous Case number of 2:18-mc-00107 RSL (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Petition (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff Justin Works. (Taylor, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Kristin D. Casavant re #1 Petition (Other) by Plaintiff Justin Works (Taylor, Paul) Modified on 10/30/2018 (Includes copy of foreign subpoena) (CDA). [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Michael J. Pineault filed by Plaintiff Justin Works re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case (Taylor, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Plaintiff Justin Works. Noting Date 11/16/2018, (Taylor, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION/MOTION to Quash Subpoena (Receipt # 0981-5525187), filed by Justin Works.(Taylor, Paul) Modified on 10/30/2018 to correct event. (Noted by clerk for 11/16/18) (CDA). [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/26/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mylan, Inc. et al v Justin Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Justin Works
Represented By: Chad C. Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mylan Specialty, LP
Represented By: Brian C. Fries
Represented By: Philip A. Sechler
Represented By: Lee Turner Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mylan Inc.
Represented By: Brian C. Fries
Represented By: Philip A. Sechler
Represented By: Lee Turner Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Epipen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?