Nekouee v. DEER CREEK LOTS 1, 3 AND 6 07 A, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Defendant: Deer Creek Lots 1, 3 and 6 07 A, LLC, Pan Kansas LLC and Four B Corp.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02652
Filed: December 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Four B Corp. (Mulhern, Matthew)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Fred Nekouee upon Deer Creek Lots 1, 3 and 6 07 A, LLC served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019 (Vincze, Robert)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Pan Kansas LLC.(Thompson, Phillip)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Robert J. Luder on behalf of Four B Corp.. (Luder, Robert)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 01/10/2019 for Defendant Four B Corp. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/14/2018. (ca)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Matthew F. Mulhern on behalf of Four B Corp.. (Mulhern, Matthew)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Fred Nekouee upon Pan Kansas LLC served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018 (Vincze, Robert)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Fred Nekouee upon Four B Corp. served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018 (Vincze, Robert)
December 3, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deer Creek Lots 1, 3 and 6 07 A, LLC, Four B Corp., Pan Kansas LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 3, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 2, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee. (Vincze, Robert)
December 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4648639.), filed by Fred Nekouee.(Vincze, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nekouee v. DEER CREEK LOTS 1, 3 AND 6 07 A, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deer Creek Lots 1, 3 and 6 07 A, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan Kansas LLC
Represented By: Phillip C. Thompson
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four B Corp.
Represented By: Matthew F. Mulhern
Represented By: Robert J. Luder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Represented By: Robert J. Vincze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?