Yellowdog Partners, LP v. CURO Group Holdings Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Yellowdog Partners, LP and Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois
Defendant: William Baker, Roger W. Dean, CURO Group Holdings Corp. and Donald F. Gayhardt
Case Number: 2:2018cv02662
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of U. Seth Ottensoser, and granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Seth Meyer as counsel for Yellowdog Partners, LP pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/28/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ashley Keller and granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Travis Lenkner as counsel for Yellowdog Partners, LP pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/28/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION (Joint) Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint by William Baker, CURO Group Holdings Corp., Roger W. Dean, Donald F. Gayhardt. (Durone, Anthony)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Seth Meyer to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4694460.) by Plaintiff Yellowdog Partners, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Appear PHV - Seth Meyer, #2 ECF Registration Form - Seth Meyer)(Walsh, Larkin) (Additional attachment added on 1/25/2019: #3 Signed Affidavit of Seth Meyer) (kao). Modified on 1/25/2019 to add signed affidavit. (kao)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STRIKING re #6 Stipulation. Proposed Order should not be filed. See D. Kan. Rule 5.4.4.(e). Counsel directed to submit as an e-mail attachment sent to ksd_gale_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov in Word format. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/25/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney U. Seth Ottensoser to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4694453.) by Plaintiff Yellowdog Partners, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Appear PHV - U. Seth Ottensoser, #2 ECF Registration Form - U. Seth Ottensoser)(Walsh, Larkin) (Additional attachment added on 1/25/2019: #3 Signed Affidavit of U. Seth Ottensoser) (kao). Modified on 1/25/2019 to add signed affidavit. (kao)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Travis Lenkner to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4694447.) by Plaintiff Yellowdog Partners, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Appear PHV - Travis Lenkner, #2 ECF Registration Form - Travis Lenkner)(Walsh, Larkin) (Additional attachment added on 1/25/2019: #3 Signed Affidavit of Travis Lenkner) (kao). Modified on 1/25/2019 to add signed affidavit. (kao)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Ashley Keller to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4694431.) by Plaintiff Yellowdog Partners, LP (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit In Support of Motion for Leave to Appear PHV - Ashley Keller, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form - Ashley Keller)(Walsh, Larkin) (Additional attachment added on 1/25/2019: #3 Signed Affidavit of Ashley Keller) (kao). Modified on 1/25/2019 to add signed affidavit. (kao)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 (STRICKEN PER DOC 10 TEXT ORDER) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by William Baker, CURO Group Holdings Corp., Roger W. Dean, Donald F. Gayhardt. (Durone, Anthony)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Anthony J. Durone on behalf of CURO Group Holdings Corp. (Durone, Anthony)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yellowdog Partners, LP. William Baker waiver sent on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019; CURO Group Holdings Corp. waiver sent on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019; Roger W. Dean waiver sent on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019; Donald F. Gayhardt waiver sent on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (Hudson, Ryan)
December 5, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Yellowdog Partners, LP - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hudson, Ryan)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Yellowdog Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Attorneys)(Hudson, Ryan)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4652196.), filed by Yellowdog Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 PSLRA CERTIFICATE)(Hudson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellowdog Partners, LP v. CURO Group Holdings Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger W. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURO Group Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Anthony J. Durone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald F. Gayhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yellowdog Partners, LP
Represented By: Larkin E. Walsh
Represented By: Ryan C. Hudson
Represented By: Ashley Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Seth Meyer
Represented By: U. Seth Ottensoser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?