Rainbow Real Estate Partners II, LLC v. Kansas City Transitional Care Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rainbow Real Estate Partners II, LLC
Defendant: Skilled Healthcare Group, Inc. and Kansas City Transitional Care Center, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02698
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
2 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice.(hw)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Rainbow Real Estate Partners II, LLC Without Prejudice (McPherson, Brendan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Personal Service by Rainbow Real Estate Partners II, LLC upon Skilled Healthcare Group, Inc. served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019 (McPherson, Brendan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Personal Service by Rainbow Real Estate Partners II, LLC upon Kansas City Transitional Care Center, LLC served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019 (McPherson, Brendan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. District Judge Carlos Murguia no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/26/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cs)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Rainbow Real Estate Partners II, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (McPherson, Brendan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Rainbow Real Estate Partners II, LLC. (McPherson, Brendan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4664726.), filed by Rainbow Real Estate Partners II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McPherson, Brendan)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas City Transitional Care Center, LLC, Skilled Healthcare Group, Inc. (Issued to Attorney for service.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainbow Real Estate Partners II, LLC v. Kansas City Transitional Care Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rainbow Real Estate Partners II, LLC
Represented By: Brendan McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skilled Healthcare Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Transitional Care Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?