Friday v. Allura USA LLC et al

Plaintiff: John W. Friday
Defendant: Plycem USA, Inc., Elementia S.A.B. De. C.V., Elementia USA, Inc., Allura USA LLC and Plycem USA LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02701
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elementia S.A.B. De. C.V., Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC identifying Elementia S.A.B. de C.V. as corporate parent (Keatley, Edward)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants Elementia USA, Inc. and Elementia S.A.B. de C.V. are granted a 24-day extension of time, to and including February 25, 2019, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
January 21, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants Elementia S.A.B. De. C.V., Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Keatley, Edward)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Plycem USA LLC's Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant Plycem USA LLC is granted a 45-day extension of time, to and including February 25, 2019, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
January 10, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Plycem USA LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Keatley, Edward)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell M. Breit for John W. Friday pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/20/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Mitchell M. Breit to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4666384.) by Plaintiff John W. Friday (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Boswell, Brittany)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/19/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
December 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allura USA LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff John W. Friday - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Boswell, Brittany)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff John W. Friday. (Boswell, Brittany)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4665134.), filed by John W. Friday.(Boswell, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friday v. Allura USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia S.A.B. De. C.V.
Represented By: Edward Benton Keatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia USA, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Benton Keatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allura USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA LLC
Represented By: Amy D. Fitts
Represented By: Edward Benton Keatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Friday
Represented By: Brittany A. Boswell
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?