Harris v. Shawnee Mission Health Center et al
Plaintiff: Christina L. Harris
Defendant: Shawnee Mission Health Center, Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc. and Shawnee Mission Medical Center, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02704
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Shawnee Mission Medical Center, Inc.(Sheffield, Robert)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON THE PARTIES' STIPULATED SUBSTITUTION OF DEFENDANT: Shawnee Mission Medical Center, Inc. added. Shawnee Mission Health Center terminated. See Order for deadlines and additional details. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 01/25/2019. (tvn)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Stipulated Substitution of Defendant by Shawnee Mission Health Center. (Sheffield, Robert)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Sheffield, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 3/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/11/19. (alm)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc., Shawnee Mission Health Center.(Sheffield, Robert)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 01/10/2019 for Defendants Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc., Shawnee Mission Health Center to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/27/2018. (ca)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc., Shawnee Mission Health Center identifying Adventist Health System Sunbelt Health Corporation as corporate parent . (Sheffield, Robert)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 **PLEASE DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR** Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc., Shawnee Mission Health Center (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Sheffield, Robert) Modified on 12/27/2018 to edit text, motion filed in error. (ydm).
December 20, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc., Shawnee Mission Health Center - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Sheffield, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc., Shawnee Mission Health Center. (Sheffield, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 18CV06285 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4666765.), filed by Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc., Shawnee Mission Health Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sheffield, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Shawnee Mission Health Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnee Mission Health Center
Represented By: Robert A. Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventist Health System/Sunbelt, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnee Mission Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina L. Harris
Represented By: Eric S. Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?