State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance, Co. v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Vicki Ross, Curtis Ross and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02006
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint in Interpleader by Curtis Ross, Vicki Ross.(Helbert, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 02/22/2019 for Defendants Vicki Ross, Curtis Ross to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 02/07/2019. (ca)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCUMENT INCORRECTLY FILED***Application for Extension of Time to Answer ANSWER to Complaint by Curtis Ross, Vicki Ross.(Helbert, Michael) (Modified on 2/7/2019 to block from public view; document should not have been filed. Attorney will submit clerk's extension to clerk's office. (heo))
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of Appearance of Michael C. Helbert by Curtis Ross, Vicki Ross.(Helbert, Michael) Modified on 2/7/2019 to correct since the incorrect event was used (hw).
January 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service). (ca)
January 7, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Curtis Ross, Vicki Ross. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance, Co. identifying State Auto Financial Corporation as corporate parent . (Probasco, Angela)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance, Co. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Probasco, Angela)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance, Co.. (Probasco, Angela)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4675073.), filed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance, Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Probasco, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance, Co. v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Ross
Represented By: Michael C. Helbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Ross
Represented By: Michael C. Helbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela Probasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?