A&J Manufacturing, LLC v. L.A.D. Global Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A&J Manufacturing, LLC
Defendant: L.A.D. Global Enterprises, Inc. and Hangzhou Xiaoshan Zhengda Textile Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02009
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 24 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A corrected version of document #23 Letter has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (hw)
January 7, 2019 Filing 23 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw) Modified on 1/8/2019. Original document contained the incorrect state in heading. (hw).
January 7, 2019 Filing 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00050. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Dismiss and granting #10 Motion to transfer. Defendant Hangzhou is dismissed. The Court transfers Plaintiff's Complaint and remaining claims against Defendant LAD to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas, First Division. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/7/19. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Withdrawal of Theresa Davis Beaton as counsel for Plaintiff in this case. Mark D. Johnson will continue as counsel for Plaintiff in this case. Attorney Theresa Davis Beaton terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on December 18, 2018. (edd) Modified on 12/18/2018 (ca). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
December 14, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by A&J Manufacturing, LLC. Responses due by 12/28/2018. (Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #16 Order, filed by A&J Manufacturing, LLC. (Johnson, Mark) Modified on 12/10/2018 (ca). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by A&J Manufacturing, LLC Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Hangzhou. (Johnson, Mark) Modified on 12/10/2018 (ca). Modified on 12/10/2018 (jlh). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that Plaintiff is to update the Court as to the status of its efforts to serve Defendant Hangzhou and whether it intends to continue legal action against Hangxhou. (Compliance due by 12/10/2018.) Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/10/18. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Judge Lisa G. Wood no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/6/2018. (pts) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Administratively Staying this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/7/2018. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave of Absence by Mark D. Johnson for the dates of June 8 through June 18, 2018; and October 21 through October 29, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on January 31, 2018. (pmh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
January 23, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to A&J Manufacturing, LLC. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
January 23, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to A&J Manufacturing, LLC for dates of : June 8-18, 2018 and October 21-29, 2018 by A&J Manufacturing, LLC. Responses due by 2/6/2018. (Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
December 14, 2017 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by L.A.D. Global Enterprises, Inc. (Smith, Jonathan) Modified on 12/14/2017 (wwp). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by A&J Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
November 17, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by L.A.D. Global Enterprises, Inc.. Responses due by 12/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Business Entity Search, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Christopher Davis)(Smith, Jonathan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
September 29, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hangzhou Xiaoshan Zhengda Textile Co., Ltd. answer due 11/17/2017; L.A.D. Global Enterprises, Inc. answer due 11/17/2017. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, up to and including 11/17/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/29/2017. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
September 15, 2017 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
September 15, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . by A&J Manufacturing, LLC. Responses due by 9/29/2017. (Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by A&J Manufacturing, LLC. L.A.D. Global Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent on 7/20/2017, answer due 9/18/2017. (Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
April 28, 2017 Filing 5 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to L.A.D. Global Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Hangzhou Xiaoshan Zhengda Textile Co., Ltd.) (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A&J Manufacturing, LLC. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/27/2017. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by A&J Manufacturing, LLC. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J2152911. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A&J Manufacturing, LLC v. L.A.D. Global Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.A.D. Global Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hangzhou Xiaoshan Zhengda Textile Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&J Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?