NBH Bank v. M2S Marketing, LLC
Plaintiff: NBH Bank
Defendant: M2S Marketing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02025
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held by telephone on 3/8/2019. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard S. Bonfiglio for M2S Marketing, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Richard S. Bonfiglio to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4705452.) by Counter Claimant M2S Marketing, LLC, Defendant M2S Marketing, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Troppito, Chris) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2019: #3 Ink Signed Affidavit and ECF Form of Attorney Richard Bonfiglio) (gw)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against NBH Bank by M2S Marketing, LLC. ( FILED IN DOUGLAS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 1/17/2019)(ydm)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - Personal Service ( Process Server) by NBH Bank upon M2S Marketing, LLC on 12/19/2018. (FILED IN DOUGLAS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/19/2018) (ydm)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Douglas County, Kansas. (Troppito, Chris)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 3/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/31/2019. (ts)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff NBH Bank - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Finkeldei, Bradley)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NBH Bank . (Finkeldei, Bradley)
January 17, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of State Court Filings by M2S Marketing, LLC. (Troppito, Chris)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by M2S Marketing, LLC of Notice of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Troppito, Chris)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant M2S Marketing, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Troppito, Chris)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by M2S Marketing, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Troppito, Chris)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant M2S Marketing, LLC. (Troppito, Chris)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Douglas County District Court, case number 2018-CV-000332 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4687362.), filed by M2S Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1 - Petition & Summons, #2 Exhibit EX 2 - Answer & Counterclaims, #3 Exhibit EX 3 - Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal)(Troppito, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NBH Bank v. M2S Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBH Bank
Represented By: Bradley R. Finkeldei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M2S Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Chris M. Troppito
Represented By: Richard S. Bonfiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?