Williams v. Thompson

Plaintiff: Freddie L. Williams and Freddie Williams
Defendant: Kay Thompson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02035
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Kay Thompson re: #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Hayes, Tracy)
March 4, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Freddie Williams (Attachments: #1 Inmate Balance History Report; #2 Envelope) (smnd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Freddie Williams re: #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Freddie Williams re #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Attachments: #1 Exhibits; #2 Envelope) (smnd)
February 15, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED due to case type/case reassignment as to: #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery, #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge.(kao)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow for all further proceedings. District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case. Entered by Deputy Clerk on 02/15/19. Mailed to pro se party Freddie Williams by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Kay Thompson re: #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Hayes, Tracy)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Defendant Kay Thompson re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Hearing, #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Hayes, Tracy)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Defendant Kay Thompson. (Hayes, Tracy)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Freddie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (ht)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Freddie Williams re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and MOTION for Hearing by Plaintiff Freddie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Proof of Service Pursuant to Rule 81.1 by Kay Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hayes, Tracy)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Kay Thompson(Hayes, Tracy)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Kay Thompson (Hayes, Tracy)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A redacted version of #4 State Court Records has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (ca)
January 24, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Document #4 State Court Records, is not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORDS from Wyandotte County. (Hayes, Tracy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #1 Redacted State Court Records) (ca).
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Kay Thompson - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hayes, Tracy)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Kay Thompson. (Hayes, Tracy)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte, case number 2018-CV-000713 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4692794.), filed by Kay Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hayes, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Thompson
Represented By: Tracy M. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?