Bowers v. Barrier Compliance Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Eric L. Bowers
Defendant: Kirk A. Kaiser and Barrier Compliance Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02045
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Barrier Compliance Services LLC and Kirk A. Kaiser are granted an extension to 4/18/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/18/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Barrier Compliance Services LLC, Kirk A. Kaiser (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Walters, Matthew)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Eric L. Bowers upon Kirk A. Kaiser served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019 (Ross, Nathan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Eric L. Bowers upon Barrier Compliance Services LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019 (Ross, Nathan)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Eric L. Bowers - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Ross, Nathan)
January 25, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barrier Compliance Services LLC, Kirk A. Kaiser. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
January 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 25, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Ross, Nathan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Eric Lee Bowers. (Ross, Nathan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4694935.), filed by Eric Lee Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Registration)(Ross, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Barrier Compliance Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric L. Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk A. Kaiser
Represented By: Matthew B. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrier Compliance Services LLC
Represented By: Matthew B. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?