Finke v. Ensign Group, Inc, The et al
Plaintiff: Gene Finke
Defendant: Post Acute Medical, LLC, Ensign Group, Inc, The, Gateway Healthcare, Inc., Ensign Services, Inc., Maple Hills Healthcare, Inc and Heartland Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02056
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. The parties' respective Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) initial disclosures should be submitted by 4/8/2019, sent as an e-mail attachment to ksd_gale_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw)
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Heartland Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC, Post Acute Medical, LLC re: #10 MOTION to Sever (Vaughn, C.)
February 28, 2019 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Ensign Group, Inc, The, Ensign Services, Inc., Gateway Healthcare, Inc., Maple Hills Healthcare, Inc - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Clark, Bret)
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Ensign Group, Inc, The, Ensign Services, Inc., Gateway Healthcare, Inc., Maple Hills Healthcare, Inc. (Clark, Bret) Modified title on 2/28/2019 (tvn).
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bret A. Clark on behalf of Ensign Group, Inc, The, Ensign Services, Inc., Gateway Healthcare, Inc., Maple Hills Healthcare, Inc. (Clark, Bret)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Todd A. Scharnhorst on behalf of Ensign Group, Inc, The, Ensign Services, Inc., Gateway Healthcare, Inc., Maple Hills Healthcare, Inc. (Scharnhorst, Todd)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Gene Finke re #10 MOTION to Sever (Steele, Jonathan)
February 12, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #10 MOTION to Sever . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #10 MOTION to Sever by Defendants Heartland Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC, Post Acute Medical, LLC(Vaughn, C.)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Sever by Defendants Heartland Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC, Post Acute Medical, LLC (Vaughn, C.)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Heartland Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC, Post Acute Medical, LLC.(Vaughn, C.)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by C. Zachary Vaughn on behalf of Heartland Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC, Post Acute Medical, LLC. (Vaughn, C.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Gene Finke upon Post Acute Medical, LLC served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (hw)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Gene Finke of First Amended Complaint on Post Acute Medical, LLC (Steele, Jonathan)
February 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Heartland Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 (PLEASE DISREGARD - SEE DE #7 FOR CORRECT FILING) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Gene Finke of Complaint and Summons on Post Acute Medical, LLC (Steele, Jonathan) Modified on 2/11/2019 (hw).
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Gene Finke. (Steele, Jonathan) Incorrect event used. Modified title on 2/6/2019 (tvn).
February 4, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ensign Group, Inc, The, Ensign Services, Inc., Gateway Healthcare, Inc., Maple Hills Healthcare, Inc, Post Acute Medical, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
February 1, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Gene Finke. (Steele, Jonathan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Gene Finke - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Steele, Jonathan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4701477.), filed by Gene Finke.(Steele, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finke v. Ensign Group, Inc, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Acute Medical, LLC
Represented By: C. Zachary Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensign Group, Inc, The
Represented By: Todd A. Scharnhorst
Represented By: Bret A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Scharnhorst
Represented By: Bret A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensign Services, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Scharnhorst
Represented By: Bret A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maple Hills Healthcare, Inc
Represented By: Todd A. Scharnhorst
Represented By: Bret A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC
Represented By: C. Zachary Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Finke
Represented By: Jonathan T. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?