Ross v. Promise Keepers, Inc., The et al
Plaintiff: Kendra Ross
Defendant: The Promise Keepers 417 Inc., The Promise Keepers, Inc., Promise Keepers 417, Inc., The, Promise Keepers 417 Inc., The and Promise Keepers, Inc., The
Petitioner: Ephraim Woods, Jr. and Irma Dorsey
Case Number: 2:2019cv02091
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: From the date of consolidation for discovery purposes, all future non-dispositive filings should be made in the lead case. (hw)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Consolidate Cases. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2), post-judgment discovery in Case No. 17-2547-DDC-TJJ and pre-trial discovery in Case No. 19-2091- DDC-TJJ is hereby consolidated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the lower-numbered case, 17-2547-DDC-TJJ, shall be designated as the lead case. All future non-dispositive filings in the consolidated action shall be made only in the lead case, No. 17-2547-DDC-TJJ, until further order; however, all such future filings shall be double-captioned as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/11/19. (hw)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER striking the responses filed by Ephraim Woods, Jr. (ECF No. #63 ) and Irma Dorsey (ECF No. #64 ) from the record of this case. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to remove those responses from the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/9/2019. Mailed to Ephraim Woods, Jr. and Irma Dorsey by regular mail. (ts)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER striking #36 Response; #37 Response; #42 Motion to Vacate Default Judgment ; #43 Motion to Vacate Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 4/8/2019.Mailed to movants Ephraim Woods and Irma Dorsey by regular mail. (ydm)
April 5, 2019 Filing 64 (STRICKEN PER #66 ORDER) RESPONSE by Movant Irma Dorsey re #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (tvn) Modified on 4/10/2019 (tvn).
April 5, 2019 Filing 63 (STRICKEN PER #66 ORDER) RESPONSE by Movant Ephraim Woods, Jr. re #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (tvn) Modified on 4/10/2019 (tvn).
April 4, 2019 Filing 62 RETURN OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Posting of Verified Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian)
April 4, 2019 Filing 61 RETURN OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Posting of Verified Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian)
April 4, 2019 Filing 60 RETURN OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Posting of Verified Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #48 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Submit Ex Parte Affidavit for Confidential In Camera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/1/2019. Mailed to pro se parties The Promise Keepers, Inc.; The Promise Keepers 417 Inc.; and The Promise Keepers 417, Inc. by regular mail at the addresses provided in the Certificate of Service of ECF No. 48. (ts)
April 1, 2019 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Kendra Ross(Chadwick, Gillian)
April 1, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Chadwick, Gillian)
April 1, 2019 Filing 56 RETURN OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Posting of Preliminary Injunction Order upon The Promise Keepers, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian)
April 1, 2019 Filing 55 RETURN OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Posting of Preliminary Injunction Order upon The Value Creators, LLC c/o Griegory Moten filed by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian)
April 1, 2019 Filing 54 RETURN OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Posting of Preliminary Injunction Order upon The Value Creators, Inc. f/k/a The United Nation of Islam, Inc. c/o Griegory Moten filed by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian)
April 1, 2019 Filing 53 RETURN OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Posting of Preliminary Injunction Order upon The Promise Keeprs 417 Inc. c/o Ephraim Woods filed by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian)
April 1, 2019 Filing 52 RETURN OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Posting of Preliminary Injunction Order upon The Value Creators Inc. c/o Griegory Moten filed by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian)
April 1, 2019 Filing 51 RETURN OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Posting of Preliminary Injunction Order upon Royall Jenkins filed by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian)
April 1, 2019 Filing 50 RETURN OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Posting of Preliminary Injunction Order upon The Promise Keepers, Inc. c/o Ephraim Woods filed by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian)
April 1, 2019 Filing 49 RETURN OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service of Preliminary Injunction Order upon The Promise Keepers, Inc. c/o Irma Dorsey filed by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian)
March 27, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to file Motion for Leave to Submit Ex Parte Affidavit for Confidential In Camera Review by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Chadwick, Gillian)
March 27, 2019 Filing 47 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Kendra Ross re: #43 MOTION for Order, #42 MOTION for Order Response to Non-Parties' Motions to Vacate Default Judgment (Chadwick, Gillian)
March 27, 2019 Filing 46 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: STATUS CONFERENCE held by telephone on 3/27/2019. Plaintiff appeared through counsel, Elizabeth A. Hutson. There were no other appearances. In light of the filing of Plaintiff's #45 Verified Amended Complaint, the Court did not conduct a Scheduling Conference. The Court will set another Scheduling Conference following service of the amended complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
March 26, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Promise Keepers 417 Inc., The, Promise Keepers 417, Inc., The, Promise Keepers, Inc., The. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
March 25, 2019 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Promise Keepers 417 Inc., The, Promise Keepers, Inc., The, filed by Kendra Ross. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex, D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G, #8 Ex. H, #9 Ex. I, #10 Ex. J, #11 Ex. K, #12 Ex. L, #13 Ex. M, #14 Ex. N, #15 Ex. O, #16 Ex. P, #17 Ex. Q, #18 Ex. R, #19 Ex. S, #20 Ex. T, #21 Ex. U, #22 Ex. V, #23 Ex. W)(Chadwick, Gillian)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #39 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's original complaint names two Defendants: The Promise Keepers, Inc. and The Promise Keepers 417 Inc. Neither Defendant has filed a responsive pleading or a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b), (e), or (f). Accordingly, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1), Plaintiff may amend her complaint once as a matter of course. However, in light of the directive in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2) that the court should freely give leave when justice so requires, the Court finds justice does require an order granting Plaintiff leave to file the proposed Verified Amended Complaint (ECF No. 39-1). Plaintiff shall electronically file her proposed Verified Amended Complaint within five (5) business days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall serve summons and the Verified Amended Complaint upon the newly added Defendant within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the Verified Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/22/2019. Mailed to defendants The Promise Keepers, Inc. and The Promise Keepers 417 Inc., by regular mail at the addresses provided in the Certificate of Service of document #16 . (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
March 20, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #43 MOTION for Order, #42 MOTION for Order. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
March 19, 2019 Filing 43 (STRICKEN PER #65 ORDER) MOTION for Order (Titled: Motion to Vacate Default Judgment) by Movant Ephraim Woods, Jr. (ydm) Modified on 4/8/2019 (ydm).
March 19, 2019 Filing 42 (STRICKEN PER #65 ORDER) MOTION for Order (Titled: Motion to Vacate Default Judgment) by Movant Irma Dorsey (ydm) Modified on 4/8/2019 (ydm).
March 19, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #39 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Plaintiff Kendra Ross(Chadwick, Gillian)
March 19, 2019 Filing 40 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document originally attached to Docket Entry #1 Complaint referenced personal information. A redacted version has been attached to the entry and is being provided with this entry for notification purposes. (ydm)
March 19, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chadwick, Gillian)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 01:30 PM Central Standard Time by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. The Court advises Defendants, both of which are corporations, that a corporation may appear in the federal courts only through licensed counsel. The Court will not require the parties to hold a conference or submit a report at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/13/2019. Mailed to defendants The Promise Keepers, Inc. and The Promise Keepers 417 Inc. by regular mail. (ts)
March 12, 2019 Filing 37 (STRICKEN PER #65 ORDER) RESPONSE (Titled: MOTION FOR OBJECTION THE PROMISE KEEPERS WAS NOT A PARTY TO Case No. 2:17 -CV-2547-DDC-TJJ ORIGINAL ACTION) by Movant Ephraim Woods, Jr. re #31 Memorandum and Order. (ydm) Modified on 4/8/2019 (ydm).
March 12, 2019 Filing 36 (STRICKEN PER #65 ORDER) RESPONSE (Titled: MOTION FOR OBJECTION THE PROMISE KEEPERS WAS NOT A PARTY TO Case No. 2:17 -CV-2547-DDC-TJJ ORIGINAL ACTION) by Movant Irma Dorsey re #31 Memorandum and Order. (ydm) Modified on 4/8/2019 (ydm).
March 8, 2019 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held March 6, 2019 before Judge Daniel D. Crabtree, Court Reporter Kim Greiner, 913-735-2314, kim_greiner@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: McGuire Woods. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2019. (kg)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Other Equitable Relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the #8 Temporary Restraining Order, effective until the entry of this Order, is now replaced by the Preliminary Injunction entered by this Order. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 3/7/2019. (ydm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree: MOTION HEARING held on 3/6/2019 re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Other Equitable Relief filed by Kendra Ross. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) (mig)
March 5, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Other Equitable Relief (Request for Judicial Notice) by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chadwick, Gillian)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER striking #21 Motion for Order; #22 Motion for Order; #23 Motion for Order; #24 Motion for Order; #25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #28 Motion for Order; and #29 Motion for Order. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 03/05/2019. Mailed to movants Ephraim Woods, Jr. and Irma Dorsey via regular mail. (mig)
March 5, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Exhibit by Kendra Ross (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S)(Chadwick, Gillian)
March 5, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #23 MOTION for Order, #21 MOTION for Order, #22 MOTION for Order, #28 MOTION for Order, #24 MOTION for Order, #29 MOTION for Order. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
March 4, 2019 Filing 29 (STRICKEN PER #31 ORDER) MOTION for Order (Titled "Motion to Object") by Movant Irma Dorsey (tvn) Modified on 3/6/2019 (tvn).
March 4, 2019 Filing 28 (STRICKEN PER #31 ORDER) MOTION for Order (Titled "Motion to Object") by Movant Ephraim Woods, Jr. (tvn) Modified on 3/6/2019 (tvn).
March 1, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Other Equitable Relief (Request for Judicial Notice) by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 C, #4 D, #5 E, #6 F, #7 G, #8 H, #9 I, #10 J, #11 K, #12 L, #13 M, #14 N, #15 O, #16 P, #17 Q, #18 R, #19 S, #20 T, #21 U, #22 V)(Chadwick, Gillian)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to extend the Temporary Restraining Order. Temporary Restraining Order extended to March 14, 2019. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 2/28/2019. Mailed to defendants The Promise Keepers, Inc. and The Promise Keepers 417 Inc., by regular mail at the addresses provided in the Certificate of Service of document #16 . (ydm) Modified text regarding mailing on 3/6/2019 (tvn).
February 27, 2019 Filing 26 (STRICKEN PER #31 ORDER) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Titled: MOTION TO DISMISS ON THE GROUNDS OF 12(B)(6) AND 12(B)(l)) by Movant Ephraim Woods, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ydm) Modified on 3/6/2019 (tvn).
February 27, 2019 Filing 25 (STRICKEN PER #31 ORDER) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Titled: MOTION TO DISMISS ON THE GROUNDS OF 12(B)(6) AND 12(B)(l)) by Movant Irma Dorsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ydm) Modified on 3/6/2019 (tvn).
February 27, 2019 Filing 24 (STRICKEN PER #31 ORDER) MOTION for Order (Titled: Notice and Demand Counterclaim) by Movant Ephraim Woods, Jr. (ydm) Modified on 3/6/2019 (tvn).
February 27, 2019 Filing 23 (STRICKEN PER #31 ORDER) MOTION for Order ( Titled: Notice and Demand Counterclaim) by Movant Irma Dorsey. (ydm) Modified on 3/6/2019 (tvn).
February 27, 2019 Filing 22 (STRICKEN PER #31 ORDER) MOTION for Order (Titled: Judicial Demand and Notice) by Movant Irma Dorsey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (ydm) Modified on 3/6/2019 (tvn).
February 27, 2019 Filing 21 (STRICKEN PER #31 ORDER) MOTION for Order (Titled- Judicial Demand and Notice) by Movant Ephraim Woods, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Exhibits) (ydm) Modified on 3/6/2019 (tvn).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave of Court for Appearance by Legal Intern Audrey Koehler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/26/2019. (ydm)
February 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to file for Appearance by Legal Intern by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Supervising Attorney Certificate, #3 Kansas Supreme Court Receipt)(Chadwick, Gillian)
February 25, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #16 MOTION for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #16 MOTION for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Kendra Ross(Chadwick, Gillian)
February 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian)
February 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Other Equitable Relief : (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. (mig)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Phillip C. Chang for Kendra Ross pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/19/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan T. Blank for Kendra Ross pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/19/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth A. Hutson for Kendra Ross pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/19/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Phillip C. Chang to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4717254.) by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Chadwick, Gillian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Elizabeth A. Hutson re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 by Plaintiff Kendra Ross(Chadwick, Gillian)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further proceedings. Per chambers this is a related case to 17-2547. Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson, Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/15/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(hw)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for TRO. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 2/15/19. (hw)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Other Equitable Relief by Plaintiff Kendra Ross(Chadwick, Gillian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Other Equitable Relief by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Chadwick, Gillian). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 2/19/2019 (hw).
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Jonathan T. Blank to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4715523.) by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Chadwick, Gillian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Elizabeth A. Hutson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4715512.) by Plaintiff Kendra Ross (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Chadwick, Gillian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COVER SHEET by Kendra Ross. Amendment to #2 Civil Cover Sheet . (Chadwick, Gillian) Modified on 3/20/2019 (ck).
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kendra Ross. (Chadwick, Gillian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4715366.), filed by Kendra Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Chadwick, Gillian) #17 Main Document-redacted (ydm). Modified on 3/19/2019 to add redacted main document. (ydm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Promise Keepers, Inc., The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Promise Keepers 417 Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Promise Keepers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Promise Keepers 417, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Promise Keepers 417 Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Promise Keepers, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Ross
Represented By: Gillian Chadwick
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Hutson
Represented By: Jonathan T. Blank
Represented By: Phillip C. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ephraim Woods, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Irma Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?