Bowers v. Reece & Nichols Realtors, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Eric Lee Bowers and Eric Bowers
Defendant: Sandra L Beck, Reece & Nichols Realtors, Inc. d/b/a ReeceNichols, Sandra L. Beck and Reece & Nichols Realtors, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02094
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Eric Bowers upon Sandra L. Beck served on 3/19/2019, answer due 5/13/2019 (Voytas, Richard)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Sandra L. Beck.(Brown, Mark)
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reece & Nichols Realtors, Inc. (Berman, Anna)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/3/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/19/19. (ss)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandra L. Beck. Sandra L. Beck waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Brown, Mark)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. (Voytas, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's motion does not state why a seven-week extension is needed. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 plaintiff's complaint by April 12, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 03/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Sandra L. Beck (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Brown, Mark)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Reece & Nichols Realtors, Inc..(Johnson, Eric)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Eric S. Johnson on behalf of Reece & Nichols Realtors, Inc.. (Johnson, Eric)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Anna M. Berman on behalf of Reece & Nichols Realtors, Inc.. (Berman, Anna)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark E. Brown on behalf of Sandra L. Beck. (Brown, Mark)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Eric Bowers upon Reece & Nichols Realtors, Inc. served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019 (Ross, Nathan)
February 19, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sandra L. Beck, Reece & Nichols Realtors, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
February 19, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Eric Lee Bowers - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Ross, Nathan)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Ross, Nathan)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Eric Lee Bowers. (Ross, Nathan)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4716472.), filed by Eric Lee Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ross, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Reece & Nichols Realtors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra L Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reece & Nichols Realtors, Inc. d/b/a ReeceNichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra L. Beck
Represented By: Mark E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reece & Nichols Realtors, Inc.
Represented By: Eric S. Johnson
Represented By: Anna M. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lee Bowers
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?