Davis v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Tammie Davis
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02098
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #18 Order to Show Cause,, by Plaintiff Tammie Davis(Rexford, James)
April 19, 2019 Filing 27 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James T. Rexford on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rexford, James)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 5/31/2019. Mediation deadline 10/7/2019. Discovery deadline 5/4/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/15/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/26/2020 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Dispositive motion deadline 7/1/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/4/2021 at 09:30 AM in KC Courtroom 440 (JWL/KHV) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Estimated trial time 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/16/19. (ss)
April 16, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/16/2019. (FTR: 9:03.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER finding as moot plaintiff's motion to join additional parties and to remand (ECF No. 14). During today's scheduling conference, on the record, plaintiff withdrew this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/16/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (O'Hara, James)
April 15, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Quinn on behalf of Tammie Davis (Quinn, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying plaintiff's motion to continue scheduling conference (ECF No. 21). Tomorrow's scheduling conference was set by order entered more than six weeks ago (see ECF No. 10). Plaintiff's motion fails to explain why the requested continuance is being sought less than 24 hours before the conference. In addition, plaintiff's motion is silent about the nature of her lawyer's alleged scheduling conflict, silent about whether the conflicting matter was set before or after this court entered its order setting the scheduling conference, and silent about what efforts (if any) have been made to reschedule the conflicting matter. Therefore, for lack of good cause, shown, the motion is denied, without prejudice to the filing of a more detailed motion, provided it's filed by 2:00 p.m. today. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/15/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (O'Hara, James)
April 15, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Tammie Davis (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Quinn, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend #19 does not respond to the Order to Show Cause; therefore defendant need not respond at this time to that motion. Assuming that plaintiff files a timely response to the Order to Show Cause, the Court will set deadlines for defendant's responses to plaintiff's pending motions as necessary after the Order to Show Cause has been finally resolved by the Court. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
April 10, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #19 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal,, Motion to Dismiss. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ses)
April 9, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Tammie Davis (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Quinn, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause, on or before April 19, 2019, why this action against defendant Ford Motor Company should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim, as set forth below. If plaintiff fails to respond by that date, the case shall be dismissed. If plaintiff does file a timely response to this Order to Show Cause, Ford may file a reply brief within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/09/2019. (ses)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The court finds good cause to enter the order submitted by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/2/2019. (amh)
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosures by Tammie Davis (Quinn, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Co.'s Initial Disclosures by Ford Motor Company. (Ward, Steven)
March 22, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #14 MOTION for Leave . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ses)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave by Plaintiff Tammie Davis (Quinn, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sherry A. Rozell for Ford Motor Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/1/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - In light of the filing of the #9 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, the Court deems the #6 Motion to Dismiss MOOT. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/01/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Sherry A. Rozell to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4727100.) by Defendant Ford Motor Company (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #2 ECF Registration Form Registration Form)(Ward, Steven)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 3/29/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 3/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/16/19. (ss)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Ward, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Company identifying Ford Motor Company as corporate parent . (Ward, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Co.'s Notice of Removal and Exhibits filed with Wyandotte Co., Kansas by Ford Motor Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Ward, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss from Wyandotte County, Kansas (Originally filed on 2/14/19 in state court). (Ward, Steven) Modified on 2/21/2019 to change event type to pending motion (hw).
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORDS from Wyandotte County, Kansas. (Ward, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORDS from Wyandotte County, Kansas. (Ward, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORDS from Wyandotte County, Kansas. (Ward, Steven)
February 20, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Ward, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County, Kansas, case number 2:19-CV-00003 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4718675.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Petition, #2 Exhibit 2-P's Response to D's Request for Specific Statement of Damages, #3 Exhibit 3-Service of Process Transmittal, #4 Exhibit 4-2-18-19 email from Lisa Bower, #5 Exhibit 5- Summons, #6 Exhibit 6-Wyandotte Co. docket sheet)(Ward, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Steven E. Ward
Represented By: Sherry A. Rozell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Davis
Represented By: Michael D. Quinn
Represented By: James T. Rexford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?