Hartleib v. Weiser Law Firm, PC, The et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hartleib
Defendant: Monica Ross-Williams, Robert Weiser, The Weiser Law Firm, PC and Weiser Law Firm, PC, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv02099
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER finding good cause to defer entering a scheduling order under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), as agreed by all three parties, until after the pending motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 5 and 7) have been decided. Within fourteen days of a ruling on both motions, should the case remain pending, counsel are ordered to confer and to submit a Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) planning meeting report to the undersigned's chambers via e-mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(amh)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION AND SUGGESTIONS IN SUPPORT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS: #5 Weiser Defendants and #7 Monica Ross-Williams. Plaintiff's Response deadlines are extended to 5/6/2019. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Party Monica Ross-Williams , #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Michael Hartleib (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Protzman, Andrew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #7 MOTION to Dismiss Party Monica Ross-Williams by Defendant Monica Ross-Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Otto, Theresa)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Party Monica Ross-Williams by Defendant Monica Ross-Williams (Otto, Theresa)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Robert Weiser, Weiser Law Firm, PC, The (Attachments: #1 Ex. Ex. 1, #2 Ex. Ex. 2, #3 Ex. Ex. 3, #4 Ex. Ex. 4, #5 Ex. Ex. 5, #6 Ex. Ex. 6, #7 Ex. Ex. 7, #8 Ex. Ex. 8, #9 Ex. Ex. 9, #10 Ex. Ex. 10, #11 Ex. Ex. 11, #12 Ex. Ex. 12, #13 Ex. Ex. 13, #14 Ex. Ex. 14, #15 Ex. Ex. 15, #16 Ex. Ex. 16, #17 Ex. Ex. 17, #18 Ex. Ex. 18, #19 Ex. Ex. 19, #20 Ex. Ex. 20, #21 Ex. Ex. 21, #22 Ex. Ex. 22, #23 Exhibit List Exhibits to Suggestions in Support of Defs Weiser's Motion to Dismiss)(Doherty, Mimi)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Robert Weiser, Weiser Law Firm, PC, The (Doherty, Mimi)
February 21, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INTENT TO REMOVE by Theresa A. Otto on behalf of Monica Ross-Williams (Otto, Theresa)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants The Weiser Law Firm, PC, Robert Weiser. (Doherty, Mimi)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants The Weiser Law Firm, PC, Robert Weiser - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Doherty, Mimi)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 19CV00407 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4718779.), filed by Robert Weiser, The Weiser Law Firm, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Petition)(Doherty, Mimi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartleib v. Weiser Law Firm, PC, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Ross-Williams
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Represented By: William C. Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Weiser
Represented By: Mimi E. Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Weiser Law Firm, PC
Represented By: Mimi E. Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weiser Law Firm, PC, The
Represented By: Mimi E. Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hartleib
Represented By: Andrew B. Protzman
Represented By: Benjamin A. Stelter-Embry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?