Bowers v. Service Success, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Service Success, Inc. and Steve Burbridge
Case Number: 2:2019cv02104
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by 5/21/2019. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 3/22/2019. (heo)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
February 25, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steve Burbridge, Service Success, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Nathan Ross on behalf of Eric Bowers. (Ross, Nathan)
February 25, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Eric Bowers - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Voytas, Richard)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Voytas, Richard)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Eric Lee Bowers. (Voytas, Richard)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4721992.), filed by Eric Lee Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Service Success, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Success, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Burbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?