Schwegmann v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr.
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02149
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
2 Judge: Julie A Robinson
3 Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 26 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Steven M. McKany on behalf of W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr (McKany, Steven)
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kevin A. Seely on behalf of W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr (Seely, Kevin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Darnell R. Donahue on behalf of W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr (Donahue, Darnell)
June 19, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - The following cases shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Ana Alberto v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan.,Case No. 19-cv-2135-JAR-TJJ; Oscar Salazar v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2295-JAR-TJJ; Kristina Johnson and Cliff Palifrone v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2118-JAR-TJJ; Schwegmann v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2149-JAR-TJJ; and David Johnson, Angelina Raines, and Kayla Vanwinsen v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2121-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 06/18/2019. (ses) Modified on 6/25/2019 (ses).
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION Agreeing to Transfer by Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Schult, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Notice of Related Case on or before the deadline dictated by Local Rule 23-A, or by June 18, 2019. In the alternative, the parties may stipulate to the transfer of this action to the MDL. The parties only need file any pleading required under Local Rule 23-A, and/or a stipulation to transfer, in this individual action. (See Order for details.) Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/12/2019. (bw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE: Case Number 19-MD-2887 by All Plaintiffs (Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. District Judge Carlos Murguia no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/7/19. (hw)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., filed by W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr.(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint within 30 days of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's ruling on the pending motion to consolidate and transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Y. Chanoine for Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.,Hannah Y. Chanoine for Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until June 3, 2019 for Defendants Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 05/17/2019. (tvn)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Hannah Y. Chanoine to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4807796.) by Defendants Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Schult, Thomas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Schult, Thomas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer B. Wieland on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Wieland, Jennifer)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Schult on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Schult, Thomas)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further proceedings. District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil, Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 5/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(as)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Response to this Order should be filed on or before 4/12/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/29/19. (aw)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca A. Peterson, and #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert K. Shelquist as counsel for W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/21/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Robert K. Shelquist to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4749647.) by Plaintiff W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Rebecca A. Peterson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4749604.) by Plaintiff W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: Motion for Consolidation has been filed in related case 19-2118 (#4). (hw)
March 18, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr. (Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4745101.), filed by W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr.(Schwarz, Ashlea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwegmann v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr.
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Represented By: Darnell R. Donahue
Represented By: Steven M. McKany
Represented By: Rebecca A. Peterson
Represented By: Kevin A. Seely
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?