Fortune v. Midland Funding LLC

Plaintiff: Jonathan Fortune
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02153
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Jonathan Fortune (Callahan, Ryan)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time three days. Discovery deadline 11/12/2019. Dispositive motion deadline 12/18/2019. Mediation deadline 8/16/2019. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 7/12/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/2/2019. Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 463 (CM) before District Judge Carlos Murguia. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. See attached Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/5/19. (aw)
June 5, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Madison A. Perry on behalf of Midland Funding LLC. (Perry, Madison)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's initial disclosures by Midland Funding LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosures by Jonathan Fortune. (Crump, James)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James Crump on behalf of Jonathan Fortune. (Crump, James)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/28/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/28/2019. (NOTE: As indicated in the Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling, copies of the parties' initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) must be attached to the parties' completed Rule 26(f) planning report. These disclosures will be discussed with the magistrate judge during the upcoming scheduling conference in finalizing a discovery and case plan that achieves the objectives of Rule 1.) See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/15/19. (aw)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Removal Complaint by Midland Funding LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 04/09/2019 for Defendant Midland Funding LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 03/25/2019. (ca)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Johnson County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Dickinson, Joshua)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Midland Funding LLC . (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Dickinson, Joshua)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midland Funding LLC identifying Encore Capital Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Dickinson, Joshua)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal, to Plaintiff by Midland Funding LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Dickinson, Joshua)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Midland Funding LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, case number 19CV00581 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4745639.), filed by Midland Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - State Court Action)(Dickinson, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortune v. Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Fortune
Represented By: Ryan M. Callahan
Represented By: James Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Kersten L. Holzhueter
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Madison A. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?