Hedlund v. Lever 1, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Danielle Hedlund
Defendant: Lever 1, LLC and Nolan Real Estate Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02154
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 236 (TJJ) before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 8/1/2019. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/11/2019. (mn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nolan Real Estate Services, Inc. . (Vogel, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Nolan Real Estate Services, Inc..(Vogel, David)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Lever 1, LLC.(Marsh, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Marsh on behalf of Lever 1, LLC (Marsh, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Poehling Windham on behalf of Lever 1, LLC (Windham, Lindsay)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Defendant Nolan Real Estate Services, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Nolan Real Estate Services, Inc. is granted an extension of time, to and including July 12, 2019, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Nolan Real Estate Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Vogel, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Grant W. Geary as to Danielle Hedlund (Geary, Grant)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 07/09/2019 for Defendant Lever 1, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 06/18/2019. (ca)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 07/08/2019 for Defendant Nolan Real Estate Services, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 06/18/2019. (ca)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Danielle Hedlund upon Nolan Real Estate Services, Inc. served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019 (Geary, Grant)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Danielle Hedlund upon Lever 1, LLC served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019 (Geary, Grant)
May 13, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lever 1, LLC, Nolan Real Estate Services, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Anne W. Schiavone on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Schiavone, Anne)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Mannion on behalf of Danielle Hedlund. (Mannion, Kathleen)
March 20, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4747727.), filed by Danielle Hedlund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Redacted A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit - Redacted D)(Geary, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hedlund v. Lever 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Hedlund
Represented By: Kathleen Mannion
Represented By: Anne W. Schiavone
Represented By: Grant Woodson Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lever 1, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Marsh
Represented By: Lindsay Poehling Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan Real Estate Services, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?