Birch v. Atchison, Kansas, City of et al

Plaintiff: Dale Wayne Birch and Dale W. Birch
Defendant: Atchison, Kansas, City of, Alex Moore, Adam Bush, Josh Sinclair, Matt Stout, Kurtis Page, Atchison, Kansas, Police Department and Michael Wilson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02156
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
2 Judge: James P O'Hara
3 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Atchison, Kansas, City of, Atchison, Kansas, Police Department, Adam Bush, Alex Moore, Kurtis Page, Josh Sinclair, Matt Stout, Michael Wilson of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests of June 4, 2019 (Cowell, Briana)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 06/26/2019. Mailed to pro se party Dale W. Birch by regular mail with a copy of the protective order form. (tvn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #1 Revised Order) (tvn).
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Response deadline 7/5/2019) and Discovery Requests by Plaintiff Dale W. Birch (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tvn)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 as moot plaintiff's second motion for discovery and to appoint counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 05/23/19. Mailed to pro se party by regular mail. (jc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Dale W. Birch (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tvn)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 10/22/2019. Dispositive motion deadline 12/23/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/23/2019. See Order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 05/22/2019. Mailed to pro se party Dale W. Birch by regular mail. (tvn)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 plaintiff's motion for discovery and appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 05/22/2019. Mailed to pro se party Dale W. Birch by regular mail. (tvn)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Order by Plaintiff Dale W. Birch (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hw)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORDS from Atchison County District Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Register of Actions)(Cooper, David)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Atchison, Kansas, City of, Atchison, Kansas, Police Department, Adam Bush, Alex Moore, Kurtis Page, Josh Sinclair, Matt Stout, Michael Wilson.(Cooper, David)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all further proceedings. District Judge Carlos Murguia, Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bw)
March 25, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 25, 2019 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 400, receipt number AKSDC-4753132 (ca)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Atchison Police Department, Adam Bush, City of Atchison, Alex Moore, Kurtis Page, Josh Sinclair, Matt Stout, Michael Wilson - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Cooper, David)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Atchison Police Department, Adam Bush, City of Atchison, Alex Moore, Kurtis Page, Josh Sinclair, Matt Stout, Michael Wilson. (Cooper, David)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Atchison County District Court, case number 2019-CV-000024 Trial location of Kansas City, filed by Josh Sinclair, Atchison Police Department, Adam Bush, Alex Moore, City of Atchison, Matt Stout, Michael Wilson, Kurtis Page. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cooper, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birch v. Atchison, Kansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atchison, Kansas, City of
Represented By: Briana C. Cowell
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Moore
Represented By: Briana C. Cowell
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Bush
Represented By: Briana C. Cowell
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Sinclair
Represented By: Briana C. Cowell
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Stout
Represented By: Briana C. Cowell
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurtis Page
Represented By: Briana C. Cowell
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atchison, Kansas, Police Department
Represented By: Briana C. Cowell
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wilson
Represented By: Briana C. Cowell
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Wayne Birch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale W. Birch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?